EP3540667 - REFRIGERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.06.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2019/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Mi Young 3-301, 63, Gwangjang-ro, Gwangjin-gu Seoul / KR | 02 /
LEE, Soo Young 507, 34, Sinwon-ro 136beon-gil, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2019/38] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2019/38] | Application number, filing date | 19172337.8 | 14.12.2016 | [2019/38] | Priority number, date | KR20150187003 | 26.12.2015 Original published format: KR 20150187003 | [2019/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3540667 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/08, G06Q30/06 | [2019/38] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0641 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0643 (CN);
F25D29/00 (EP);
F25D29/003 (CN);
G05B19/4185 (CN);
G06F3/04817 (US);
G06F3/0482 (US);
G06F3/0488 (US);
G06F3/165 (US);
G06F3/167 (US);
G06Q10/087 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0633 (EP,US);
H04L67/12 (CN);
F25D2400/361 (EP);
F25D2500/06 (EP);
G05B2219/2642 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/44] |
Former [2019/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KÜHLSCHRANK | [2019/38] | English: | REFRIGERATOR | [2019/38] | French: | RÉFRIGÉRATEUR | [2019/38] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/44] | 20.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.04.2021 | 11.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/30] | 21.03.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/30] | 27.04.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16204172.7 / EP3185193 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002178066 (ROH YOUNG HOON [KR], et al) [A] 1-6* paragraphs [0019] - [0047] *; | [A]US2011210822 (LEE SUNG-AE [KR], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0082] - [0089] - [ 116] - [0123] *; | [I]US2013191243 (JUNG MIJIN [KR], et al) [I] 1-6 * paragraphs [0028] - [0067] * * paragraphs [0081] - [0118] * * figures 4-10 *; | [I]EP2696314 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [I] 1-6 * paragraphs [0081] , [0 82] , [ 119] - [0151] *; | [A] - Sylvia S, "The Talking Fridge by Samsung and Cheil", Online, (20141006), URL: https://www.adstasher.com/2014/10/the-talking-fridge-by-samsung-and-cheil.html, (20190522), XP055591162 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * |