EP3581575 - DISUBSTITUTED OCTAHYDROPYRROLO[3,4-C]PYRROLES AS OREXIN RECEPTOR MODULATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.09.2020 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen Pharmaceutica NV Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [2019/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAI, Wenying 4318 Corte Al Fresco San Diego, CA California 92130 / US | 02 /
LETAVIC, Michael, A. 4379 Mistral Place San Diego, CA California 92130 / US | 03 /
LY, Kiev, S. P.O. Box 927992 San Diego, CA California 92192 / US | 04 /
PIPPEL, Daniel, J. 12795 Via Cortina Del Mar, CA California 92014 / US | 05 /
RUDOLPH, Dale, A. 12721 Alondra Court San Diego, CA California 92128 / US | 06 /
STROTHER, Kathleen, C. 3429 Borreson Street San Diego, CA California 92117 / US | 07 /
SAVALL, Brad, M. 9512 Ronda Avenue San Diego, CA California 92123 / US | 08 /
SHAH, Chandravadan, R. 14213 Dalhouside Road San Diego, CA California 92129 / US | 09 /
SHIREMAN, Brock, T. 12625 Birchbrook Court Poway, CA California 92064 / US | 10 /
SOYODE-JOHNSON, Akinola 4155 Executive Dr. Unit 212 La Jolla, CA California 92037-1361 / US | 11 /
STOCKING, Emily, M. 310 Melrose Avenue Encinitas, CA California 92024 / US | 12 /
SWANSON, Devin, M. 3121 Morning Way La Jolla, CA California 92037 / US | [2019/51] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/51] | McGuire, Gillian Margaret Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 19172579.5 | 21.10.2010 | [2019/51] | Priority number, date | US200925450909P | 23.10.2009 Original published format: US 25450909 P | [2019/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3581575 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, A61K31/407, A61P25/00 | [2019/51] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/407 (KR);
A61K31/4192 (KR);
A61K31/428 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4439 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4709 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/498 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/506 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/53 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/5377 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/12 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/50 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/30] |
Former [2019/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 15.06.2020 | ME | 15.06.2020 | Title | German: | DISUBSTITUIERTE OCTAHYDROPYRROLO[3,4-C]PYRROLE ALS OREXIN-REZEPTOR-MODULATOREN | [2019/51] | English: | DISUBSTITUTED OCTAHYDROPYRROLO[3,4-C]PYRROLES AS OREXIN RECEPTOR MODULATORS | [2019/51] | French: | OCTAHYDROPYRROLO[3,4-C]PYRROLES DISUBSTITUÉS EN TANT QUE MODULATEURS DE RÉCEPTEUR D'OREXINE | [2019/51] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/30] | 15.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10773477.4 / EP2491038 | EP16163733.5 / EP3093291 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 30.09.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 30.09.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.10.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.06.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 22.06.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.07.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004004733 (ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD [CH], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]WO2009016286 (SANOFI AVENTIS [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * examples 106-118 *; | [A]WO2009037394 (SANOFI AVENTIS [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * examples 1,2,26-30,41-45 * | by applicant | WO0181347 | US2002019388 | WO03002561 | WO03051872 | WO2004033418 | WO2004041791 | US2005065178 | US2005101602 | US2006258672 | WO2006124897 | WO2006123121 | WO2007126935 | WO2007126934 | WO2008008551 | WO2008008517 | WO2008008518 | US2008132490 | WO2008067121 | WO2008143856 | WO2009022311 | WO2009058238 | US2009163485 | WO2009081197 | WO2009124956 | WO2010017260 | WO2010048012 | WO2010048017 | WO2010048014 | WO2010048010 | WO2010048013 | WO2010051238 | WO2010051237 | WO2010051236 | WO2010060472 | WO2010060471 | WO2010060470 | WO2010063663 | WO2010063662 | US2010160344 | US2010160345 | WO2010072722 | - C. PEYRON et al., J. Neurosci., (19980000), vol. 18, no. 23, pages 9996 - 10015 | - VAN DEN POL, A.N. et al., J. Neuroscience, (19990000), vol. 19, no. 8, pages 3171 - 3182 | - T. SAKURAI, Nature Reviews Neuroscience, (20070000), vol. 8, no. 3, pages 171 - 181 | - J. HARA et al., Neuron, (20010000), vol. 30, pages 345 - 354 | - W.K. SAMSON et al., Brain Res., (19990000), vol. 831, pages 248 - 253 | - T. SHIRASAKA et al., Am. J. Physiol., (19990000), vol. 277, pages R1780 - R1785 | - C.-T. CHEN et al., Am. J. Physiol., (20000000), vol. 278, pages R692 - R697 | - A.L. KIRCHGESSNERM.-T. LIU, Neuron, (19990000), vol. 24, pages 941 - 951 | - N. TAKAHASHI et al., Biochem. Biophys. Res. Commun., (19990000), vol. 254, pages 623 - 627 | - PIPER et al., J. Neurosci., (20000000), vol. 12, pages 726 - 730 | - YAMANAKA et al., Biochem. Biophys. Res. Comm., (20020000), vol. 290, pages 1237 - 1245 | - CHEMELLI et al., Cell, (19990000), vol. 98, pages 437 - 451 | - LIN et al., Cell, (19990000), vol. 98, pages 365 - 376 | - MIGNOT et al., Am. J. Hum. Genet., (20010000), vol. 68, pages 686 - 699 | - MINOTTHORSBY, New England J. Med., (20010000), vol. 344, page 692 | - PEYRON et al., Nature Med., (20000000), vol. 6, pages 991 - 997 | - BRISBARE-ROCH et al., Nature Medicine, (20070000), vol. 13, pages 150 - 155 | - P. MALHERBE et al., Molecular Pharmacology, (20090000), vol. 76, no. 3, pages 618 - 31 | - C. DUGOVIC et al., J. Pharmacol. Exp. Ther., (20090000), vol. 330, no. 1, pages 142 - 151 | - NAKAMURA et al., Brain Research, vol. 873, no. 1, pages 181 - 7 | - KANG et al., Science Express, (20090000), pages 1 - 10 | - G. ASTON-JONES et al., Neuropharmacology, (20090000), vol. 56, no. 1, pages 112 - 121 | - J. K. KANE et al., Endocrinology, (20000000), vol. 141, no. 10, pages 3623 - 3629 | - J. K. KANE et al., Neurosci. Lett., (20010000), vol. 298, no. 1, pages 1 - 4 | - D. GEORGESCU et al., J.Neurosci., (20030000), vol. 23, no. 8, pages 3106 - 3111 | - C. J. WINROW et al., Neuropharmacology, (20100000), vol. 58, no. 1, pages 185 - 94 | - LAWRENCE, Br. J. Pharmacol., (20060000), vol. 148, pages 752 - 759 | - RICHARDS, Psychopharmacology, (20080000), vol. 199, no. 1, pages 109 - 117 | - DAYAS, Biol. Psychiatry, (20080000), vol. 63, no. 2, pages 152 - 157 | - HAMLIN, Neuroscience, (20070000), vol. 146, pages 525 - 536 | - SCHNEIDER, Alcohol. Clin. Exp. Res., (20070000), vol. 31, no. 11, pages 1858 - 1865 | - KIRCHGESSNERLIU, Neuron, (19990000), vol. 24, pages 941 - 951 | - TAKAHASHI et al., Biochem. Biophys. Res. Comm., (19990000), vol. 254, pages 623 - 627 | - T. SAKURAI et al., Cell, (19980000), vol. 92, no. 4, pages 573 - 585 | - T. SAKURAI, Reg. Pept., (19990000), vol. 85, no. 1, pages 25 - 30 | - SAMSON et al., Brain Res., (19990000), vol. 831, pages 248 - 253 | - SHIRASAKA et al., Am. J. Physiol., (19990000), vol. 277, pages R1780 - R1785 | - CHEN et al., Am. J. Physiol., (20000000), vol. 278, pages R692 - R697 | - COX et al., Bioorganic & Medicinal Chemistry Letters, (20090000), vol. 19, no. 11, pages 2997 - 3001 | - BOSS et al., Journal of Medicinal Chemistry, (20090000), vol. 52, no. 4, pages 891 - 903 | - COLEMAN et al., Bioorganic & Medicinal Chemistry Letters, (20100000), vol. 20, no. 14, pages 4201 - 4205 | - COX, Journal of Medicinal Chemistry, (20100000), vol. 53, no. 14, pages 5320 - 5332 | - COLEMAN et al., Bioorganic & Medicinal Chemistry Letters, (20100000), vol. 20, no. 7, pages 2311 - 2315 | - FROST et al., Journal of Medicinal Chemistry, (20060000), vol. 49, no. 26, pages 7843 - 7853 | - Van Nostrand's Encyclopedia of Chemistry, (20050000), page 261 | - Handbook of Chemistry and Physics, pages 8 - 37,8-44 | - PAULEKUHN et al., "Trends in Active Pharmaceutical Ingredient Salt Selection based on Analysis of the Orange Book Database", J. Med. Chem., (20070000), vol. 50, doi:doi:10.1021/jm701032y, pages 6665 - 72, XP055536811 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm701032y | - S.M. BERGE et al., "Pharmaceutical Salts", J Pharm Sci., (19770000), vol. 66, doi:doi:10.1002/jps.2600660104, pages 1 - 19, XP002675560 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600660104 | - FLEISHER et al., Adv. Drug Delivery Rev., (19960000), vol. 19, pages 115 - 130 | - ROBINSON et al., J Med Chem., (19960000), vol. 39, no. 1, pages 10 - 18 | - BERTOLINI et al., J Med Chem., (19970000), vol. 40, pages 2011 - 2016 | - SHAN et al., J Pharm Sci., (19970000), vol. 86, no. 7, pages 765 - 767 | - BAGSHAWE, Drug Dev Res., (19950000), vol. 34, pages 220 - 230 | - BODOR, Adv Drug Res., (19840000), vol. 13, pages 224 - 331 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 72287-26-4 | - FREDIANI, Catalysis Comm., (20010000), vol. 2, page 125 | - LANGMEAD et al., British Journal of Pharmacology, (20040000), vol. 141, pages 340 - 346 | - MALHERBE et al., British Journal of Pharmacology, (20090000), vol. 156, no. 8, pages 1326 - 1341 | - "Genebank", Database accession no. NM_001526 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 288150-92-5 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 1089563-88-1 |