EP3733437 - TRANSMISSION, SINGLE-CLUTCH POWERTRAIN SYSTEM, AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A SINGLE-CLUTCH POWERTRAIN SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ningbo Geely Automobile Research & Development Co. Ltd. N°. 818, Binhai 2nd Road Hangzhou Bay New District Ningbo 315336 / CN | [2022/41] |
Former [2020/45] | For all designated states Ningbo Geely Automobile Research & Development Co. Ltd. N°. 818, Binhai 2nd Road Hangzhou Bay New District Ningbo 315336 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KÄLLNER, Ola Antilopgatan 8 431 38 MÖLNDAL / SE | [2020/45] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [2022/41] |
Former [2020/45] | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 19172584.5 | 03.05.2019 | [2020/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3733437 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3733437 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60K6/442, B60K6/36, B60K6/547, F16H7/00, F16H3/00 | [2020/45] | CPC: |
B60K6/442 (EP);
B60K6/36 (EP,US);
B60K6/387 (US);
B60K6/44 (US);
B60K6/547 (EP,US);
F16H37/065 (US);
B60Y2200/92 (US);
B60Y2400/70 (US);
F16H2200/0034 (EP,US);
F16H2200/0039 (US);
F16H2200/0043 (US);
F16H3/089 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/45] | Title | German: | GETRIEBE, EINZELKUPPLUNGSANTRIEBSSTRANGSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES EINZELKUPPLUNGSANTRIEBSSTRANGSYSTEMS | [2020/45] | English: | TRANSMISSION, SINGLE-CLUTCH POWERTRAIN SYSTEM, AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A SINGLE-CLUTCH POWERTRAIN SYSTEM | [2020/45] | French: | TRANSMISSION, SYSTÈME DE TRANSMISSION À EMBRAYAGE UNIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN SYSTÈME DE TRANSMISSION À EMBRAYAGE UNIQUE | [2020/45] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2019 | Examination requested [2020/45] | 26.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 12.10.2022 | AT | 12.10.2022 | CZ | 12.10.2022 | DK | 12.10.2022 | EE | 12.10.2022 | ES | 12.10.2022 | FI | 12.10.2022 | HR | 12.10.2022 | IT | 12.10.2022 | LT | 12.10.2022 | LV | 12.10.2022 | MC | 12.10.2022 | NL | 12.10.2022 | PL | 12.10.2022 | RO | 12.10.2022 | RS | 12.10.2022 | SE | 12.10.2022 | SI | 12.10.2022 | SK | 12.10.2022 | SM | 12.10.2022 | NO | 12.01.2023 | IS | 12.02.2023 | PT | 13.02.2023 | IE | 03.05.2023 | LU | 03.05.2023 | BE | 31.05.2023 | CH | 31.05.2023 | LI | 31.05.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
AT | 12.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
MC | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SI | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
IE | 03.05.2023 | ||
LU | 03.05.2023 | ||
BE | 31.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
AT | 12.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
MC | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SI | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
IE | 03.05.2023 | ||
LU | 03.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
AT | 12.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
MC | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SI | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
LU | 03.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
AT | 12.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
MC | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SI | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
LU | 03.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
AT | 12.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SI | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
AT | 12.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
AT | 12.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 12.10.2022 | |
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 12.10.2022 | |
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 12.10.2022 | |
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 12.10.2022 | |
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 12.10.2022 | |
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 12.10.2022 | |
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 12.10.2022 | |
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/17] | NL | 12.10.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000278809 (DAIHATSU MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]EP1439086 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]); | [XAYI]US2012031229 (VENTURI STEPHANE [FR]); | [YA]DE102013112388 (HOFER FORSCHUNGS & ENTW GMBH [DE]) |