EP3546074 - APPARATUS AND METHOD TO DECENTRALIZE PROCESSING OF AN OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Matthews International Corporation Two North Shore Center Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15212 / US | [2019/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSS, David Justin 15400 NE 90th Street Suite 300 Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 02 /
TURNER, Bryan J. 15400 NE 90th Street Suite 300 Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 03 /
TRAINA, Christopher 15400 NE 90th Street Suite 300 Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 04 /
HARBACHUK, George 15400 NE 90th Street Suite 300 Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 05 /
SAAVEDRA, Diego 15400 NE 90th Street Suite 300 Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 06 /
TEUDT, Richard 15400 NE 90th Street Suite 300 Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 07 /
SAUR, Kevin 15400 NE 90th Street Suite 300 Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2019/40] | Representative(s) | Whitlock, Holly Elizabeth Ann, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [2023/37] |
Former [2019/40] | Whitlock, Holly Elizabeth Ann, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19172586.0 | 04.10.2012 | [2019/40] | Priority number, date | US201161543243P | 04.10.2011 Original published format: US 201161543243 P | US201161543264P | 04.10.2011 Original published format: US 201161543264 P | US201213628654 | 27.09.2012 Original published format: US201213628654 | [2019/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3546074 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3546074 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3546074 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B07C3/10, G06Q50/28, G06Q10/0633 | [2023/16] | CPC: |
G06Q10/0633 (EP,US);
B07C3/10 (EP,US);
G06Q10/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/40] | B07C3/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/52] |
Former [2019/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR DEZENTRALISIERUNG VON OBJEKTBEARBEITUNG | [2019/40] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD TO DECENTRALIZE PROCESSING OF AN OBJECT | [2019/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR DÉCENTRALISER LE TRAITEMENT D'UN OBJET | [2019/40] | Examination procedure | 13.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2020 | Examination requested [2020/52] | 13.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12187251.9 / EP2578325 | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.09.2023 | CZ | 13.09.2023 | DK | 13.09.2023 | EE | 13.09.2023 | FI | 13.09.2023 | HR | 13.09.2023 | LT | 13.09.2023 | LV | 13.09.2023 | MC | 13.09.2023 | PL | 13.09.2023 | RO | 13.09.2023 | RS | 13.09.2023 | SE | 13.09.2023 | SK | 13.09.2023 | SM | 13.09.2023 | LU | 04.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | NL | 01.11.2023 | NO | 13.12.2023 | GR | 14.12.2023 | IS | 13.01.2024 | PT | 15.01.2024 | DE | 01.05.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
DK | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
MC | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
LU | 04.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
DE | 01.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
DK | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
MC | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
LU | 04.10.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
DE | 01.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
MC | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
LU | 04.10.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/30] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
LU | 04.10.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 13.09.2023 | |
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03098533 (UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC [US]); | [X]US2004059462 (NORRIS MICHAEL O [US], et al); | [X]WO2009035694 (LOCKHEED CORP [US], et al); | [A]US2010100233 (LU BINH T [US]) |