14.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] |
17.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
06.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.02.2023 [2023/06] |
05.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
29.04.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 01.06.2022 [2022/22] |
22.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
25.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.03.2022 [2022/13] |
18.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] |
11.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
28.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
21.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
14.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
19.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.12.2021 [2021/51] |
12.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] |
05.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] |
22.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] |
21.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] |
21.05.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] |
18.05.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.04.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
21.04.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
21.04.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
27.01.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.12.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] |
25.12.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] |
11.12.2020 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
11.12.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.01.2021 [2021/02] |
11.12.2020 |
Change - designated states |
published on 13.01.2021 [2021/02] |
09.10.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
06.05.2019 |
Change - representative |
|