EP3735996 - BI-DIRECTIONAL PERFUSION CANNULA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Free Life Medical GmbH Kleinheidstrasse 1A 52080 Aachen / DE | [2020/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hildinger, Karl-Heinz Kleinheidstrasse 1 52080 Aachen / DE | 02 /
Schmitz, Bernhard Urftseestrasse 87 53937 Schleiden / DE | 03 /
Autschbach, Rüdiger Im Weingarten 2 52074 Aachen / DE | [2020/46] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [2023/39] |
Former [2020/46] | Gille Hrabal Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 19172988.8 | 07.05.2019 | [2020/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3735996 | Date: | 11.11.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3735996 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61M60/00, A61M1/36, A61M25/00 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
A61M1/3659 (EP);
A61M60/295 (EP,US);
A61M1/3666 (EP);
A61M25/00 (EP);
A61M60/13 (EP,US);
A61M60/38 (EP,US);
A61M60/857 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0003 (EP);
A61M2025/0073 (EP);
A61M2206/14 (EP);
A61M25/005 (EP);
A61M25/007 (EP);
A61M25/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/46] | A61M1/36, A61M25/00, A61M1/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/24] |
Former [2020/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BIDIREKTIONALE PERFUSIONSKANÜLE | [2020/46] | English: | BI-DIRECTIONAL PERFUSION CANNULA | [2020/46] | French: | CANULE DE PERFUSION BIDIRECTIONNELLE | [2020/46] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/24] | 06.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 27.09.2023 | ES | 27.09.2023 | HR | 27.09.2023 | PL | 27.09.2023 | RO | 27.09.2023 | RS | 27.09.2023 | SK | 27.09.2023 | SM | 27.09.2023 | NO | 27.12.2023 | GR | 28.12.2023 | IS | 27.01.2024 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 27.09.2023 | |
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 27.09.2023 | |
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/11] | HR | 27.09.2023 | |
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 27.12.2023 | |
GR | 28.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005085769 (MACMAHON JOHN M [US], et al); | [AD]US2018043085 (CHO YANG HYUN [KR]); | [AD]WO2019075020 (UNIV MARYLAND [US], et al) | by applicant | EP0619745 | EP2694148 | US2018043085 | WO2019075020 |