EP3584583 - AUTOMATIC ALIGNMENT AND LABEL ATTACHING APPARATUS FOR TEST TUBE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Energium Co., Ltd. No. A-1902, 606, Seobusaet-gil Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08504 / KR | [2019/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kang, Junghun No. A-1902, 606, Seobusaet-gil, Geumcheon-gu 08504 Seoul / KR | 02 /
Lee, Kanghee No. A-1902, 606, Seobusaet-gil, Geumcheon-gu 08504 Seoul / KR | 03 /
Ryu, Hophyang No. A-1902, 606, Seobusaet-gil, Geumcheon-gu 08504 Seoul / KR | 04 /
Park, Sangjun No. A-1902, 606, Seobusaet-gil, Geumcheon-gu 08504 Seoul / KR | [2019/52] | Representative(s) | Stellbrink & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | [2019/52] | Application number, filing date | 19173306.2 | 08.05.2019 | [2019/52] | Priority number, date | KR20180071017 | 20.06.2018 Original published format: KR 20180071017 | [2019/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3584583 | Date: | 25.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3584583 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01N35/00, B65G47/14, G01N35/04 | [2021/02] | CPC: |
G01N35/04 (EP);
B65C3/08 (KR);
B65C3/02 (US);
B01L9/06 (US);
B65C9/02 (CN,KR,US);
B65C9/06 (KR,US);
B65C9/40 (CN,KR,US);
G01N35/026 (US);
B01L2200/025 (US);
B01L2300/021 (US);
B01L2300/0609 (US);
B65G47/1478 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/52] | G01N35/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/24] |
Former [2019/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE AUSRICHT- UND ETIKETTENANBRINGVORRICHTUNG FÜR REAGENZRÖHRCHEN | [2019/52] | English: | AUTOMATIC ALIGNMENT AND LABEL ATTACHING APPARATUS FOR TEST TUBE | [2019/52] | French: | APPAREIL D'ALIGNEMENT AUTOMATIQUE ET DE FIXATION D'ÉTIQUETTES POUR TUBE DE TEST | [2019/52] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/24] | 06.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.05.2019 | AL | 14.07.2021 | AT | 14.07.2021 | CY | 14.07.2021 | CZ | 14.07.2021 | DK | 14.07.2021 | EE | 14.07.2021 | FI | 14.07.2021 | HR | 14.07.2021 | LT | 14.07.2021 | LV | 14.07.2021 | MC | 14.07.2021 | MK | 14.07.2021 | NL | 14.07.2021 | RO | 14.07.2021 | RS | 14.07.2021 | SE | 14.07.2021 | SI | 14.07.2021 | SK | 14.07.2021 | SM | 14.07.2021 | TR | 14.07.2021 | BG | 14.10.2021 | NO | 14.10.2021 | GR | 15.10.2021 | IS | 14.11.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/25] | HU | 08.05.2019 | |
AL | 14.07.2021 | ||
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CY | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
MK | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CY | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
MK | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CY | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/12] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP3023793 (AOI SEIKI CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,14 * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0014] * * figure 3 * [I] 2-6,12,13,15; | [XI]EP0819470 (TECHNO MEDICA CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,14 * column 1, lines 45-47 * * column 3, lines 2-6 * * column 3, lines 35-38 * * column 5, lines 31-36 * * column 4, line 19 * * column 3, lines 31-32 * * column 4, lines 51-52 * * figures 1, 8 * [I] 2-13,15; | [A]EP2495191 (MURATA MACHINERY LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15; | [A]NL9300395 (OORDSUPPOORD PRODUCT MANAGEMEN) [A] 1-15; | [A]WO2017061556 (JEOL LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 |