EP3567280 - LIFT-ROTATE MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hiwin GmbH Brücklesbünd 1 77654 Offenburg / DE | [2019/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mäurer, Werner Auf dem Nußbuckel 22 77654 Offenburg / DE | [2019/46] | Representative(s) | Geitz Patentanwälte PartG mbB Werthmannstrasse 15 79098 Freiburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/46] | Geitz Truckenmüller Lucht Christ Patentanwälte PartGmbB Werthmannstrasse 15 79098 Freiburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 19173370.8 | 08.05.2019 | [2019/46] | Priority number, date | DE201810111035 | 08.05.2018 Original published format: DE102018111035 | [2019/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3567280 | Date: | 13.11.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F16H25/12, F16H25/22, B25J9/10, // F16H25/20 | [2019/46] | CPC: |
F16H25/122 (EP);
B25J9/123 (EP);
B25J9/126 (EP);
F16H25/2204 (EP);
F16H2025/2075 (EP);
F16H2025/2096 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HUB-DREH-MODUL | [2019/46] | English: | LIFT-ROTATE MODULE | [2019/46] | French: | MODULE COMMANDÉ EN DÉPLACEMENT AXIAL OU EN ROTATION | [2019/46] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/47] | 30.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH05332416 (SANKYO SEIKI SEISAKUSHO KK) [X] 1-5,7,8,13-16 * the whole document * [I] 6,9-12; | [XI]DE10326179 (REXROTH STAR GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-8,13-15 * the whole document * [I] 9-12; | [XAI]US5540113 (TAKEI SEIJI [JP]) [X] 1-8,13,14,16 * the whole document * [A] 15 [I] 9-12; | [A]JP2000130542 (NSK LTD) [A] 10,11 * the whole document * |