Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
22.08.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.12.2022 | Change - applicant | published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
23.08.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
16.08.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.02.2021 | Change - applicant | published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
28.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant | |
04.09.2020 | Change - inventor | published on 07.10.2020 [2020/41] |
02.07.2020 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
07.02.2020 | Publication of search report | published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
07.02.2020 | Change - classification | published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
07.02.2020 | Change - classification | published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
05.12.2019 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] |
05.12.2019 | Request for examination filed | published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] |
19.07.2019 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
11.05.2019 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.05.2019 | Change - representative |