Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015024668 | Global Dossier | 30.04.2015 | A3 | WO2015024668 | 26.02.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2013EP02518 | 21.08.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024294579 | Global Dossier | 05.09.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202318348042 | 06.07.2023 | US202117316834 | 11.05.2021 | US201615048439 | 19.02.2016 | WO2014EP02301 | 21.08.2014 | US202318463276 | 07.09.2023 | WO2013EP02518 | 21.08.2013 | US202418616134 | 25.03.2024 | US201816168747 | 23.10.2018 | US201715488815 | 17.04.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023382954 | Global Dossier | 30.11.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202318348042 | 06.07.2023 | US202117316834 | 11.05.2021 | US201615048439 | 19.02.2016 | WO2014EP02301 | 21.08.2014 | WO2013EP02518 | 21.08.2013 | US201816168747 | 23.10.2018 | US201715488815 | 17.04.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9688729 | Global Dossier | 27.06.2017 | B2 | US2016168207 | 16.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP02301 | 21.08.2014 | WO2013EP02518 | 21.08.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11965000 | Global Dossier | 23.04.2024 | B2 | US2024002449 | 04.01.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202318348042 | 06.07.2023 | US202117316834 | 11.05.2021 | US201615048439 | 19.02.2016 | WO2014EP02301 | 21.08.2014 | US202318463276 | 07.09.2023 | WO2013EP02518 | 21.08.2013 | US201816168747 | 23.10.2018 | US201715488815 | 17.04.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11739125 | Global Dossier | 29.08.2023 | B2 | US2021261627 | 26.08.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117316834 | 11.05.2021 | US201615048439 | 19.02.2016 | WO2014EP02301 | 21.08.2014 | WO2013EP02518 | 21.08.2013 | US201816168747 | 23.10.2018 | US201715488815 | 17.04.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11034729 | Global Dossier | 15.06.2021 | B2 | US2019144508 | 16.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615048439 | 19.02.2016 | WO2014EP02301 | 21.08.2014 | WO2013EP02518 | 21.08.2013 | US201816168747 | 23.10.2018 | US201715488815 | 17.04.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10150797 | Global Dossier | 11.12.2018 | B2 | US2017218030 | 03.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615048439 | 19.02.2016 | WO2014EP02301 | 21.08.2014 | WO2013EP02518 | 21.08.2013 | US201715488815 | 17.04.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20160044566 | Global Dossier | 25.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP02301 | 21.08.2014 | WO2013EP02518 | 21.08.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7523897B | Global Dossier | 29.07.2024 | B2 | JP2020014474 | 30.01.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2016535370 | 21.08.2014 | WO2013EP02518 | 21.08.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6896421B | Global Dossier | 30.06.2021 | B2 | JP2016527909 | 15.09.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP02301 | 21.08.2014 | WO2013EP02518 | 21.08.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3035960 | Global Dossier | 03.07.2019 | B1 | EP3035960 | 29.06.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP14755336 | 21.08.2014 | WO2014EP02301 | 21.08.2014 | WO2013EP02518 | 21.08.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105473158B | Global Dossier | 13.04.2021 | B | CN105473158 | 06.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP02301 | 21.08.2014 | WO2013EP02518 | 21.08.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014310934B | Global Dossier | 12.09.2019 | B2 | AU2014310934 | 21.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP02301 | 21.08.2014 | WO2013EP02518 | 21.08.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3586871 | Global Dossier | 11.03.2020 | A3 | EP3586871 | 01.01.2020 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP14755336 | 21.08.2014 | WO2014EP02301 | 21.08.2014 | WO2013EP02518 | 21.08.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112016003361 | 21.11.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP02301 | 21.08.2014 | WO2013EP02518 | 21.08.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2915728 | 26.02.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP02301 | 21.08.2014 | WO2013EP02518 | 21.08.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2747762T | 11.03.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP02301 | 21.08.2014 | WO2013EP02518 | 21.08.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX369469 | 08.11.2019 | B | MX2016002154 | 05.01.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP02301 | 21.08.2014 | WO2013EP02518 | 21.08.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2723328 | 09.06.2020 | C2 | RU2016109937 | 28.03.2018 | A3 | RU2016109937 | 26.09.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP02301 | 21.08.2014 | WO2013EP02518 | 21.08.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG10201801431T | 27.04.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013EP02518 | 21.08.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11201510746W | 30.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP02301 | 21.08.2014 | WO2013EP02518 | 21.08.2013 | Type | Earlier application | EP3035960 |