Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
19.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
12.07.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
26.04.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
17.03.2023 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
26.04.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
10.09.2021 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
11.05.2021 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
11.05.2021 | First examination report | |
27.04.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
09.10.2020 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
09.10.2020 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
09.10.2020 | Request for examination filed | published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
28.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant | |
11.05.2019 | Change - representative |