EP3737127 - MOBILE COMMUNICATION NETWORK ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A MOBILE COMMUNICATION NETWORK ARRANGEMENT TO SUPPORT INTER-CORE NETWORK ROAMING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.05.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagata-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2020/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAMA, Malla Reddy c/o DOCOMO Communications Laboratories Europe GmbH Landsberger Strasse 312 80687 Munich / DE | 02 /
MUTIKAINEN, Jari c/o DOCOMO Communications Laboratories Europe GmbH Landsberger Strasse 312 80687 Munich / DE | 03 /
THAKOLSRI, Srisakul c/o DOCOMO Communications Laboratories Europe GmbH Landsberger Strasse 312 80687 Munich / DE | 04 /
MINOKUCHI, Atsushi c/o NTT DOCOMO, INC. Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagata-cho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-6150 / JP | [2020/46] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2020/46] | Application number, filing date | 19173865.7 | 10.05.2019 | [2020/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3737127 | Date: | 11.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W8/12, H04W8/06 | [2020/46] | CPC: |
H04W8/12 (EP,US);
H04W8/04 (US);
H04W8/06 (US);
H04W8/065 (EP);
H04W84/042 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOBILKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINER MOBILKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZANORDNUNG ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG VON KERNÜBERGREIFENDEM NETZWERK-ROAMING | [2020/46] | English: | MOBILE COMMUNICATION NETWORK ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A MOBILE COMMUNICATION NETWORK ARRANGEMENT TO SUPPORT INTER-CORE NETWORK ROAMING | [2020/46] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN AGENCEMENT DE RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE POUR PRENDRE EN CHARGE UNE ITINÉRANCE DE RÉSEAU INTER-C URS | [2020/46] | Examination procedure | 25.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/46] | 25.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |