Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
16.09.2024 | Change - representative | |
29.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
22.05.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
21.05.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
30.04.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant | |
25.10.2019 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
25.10.2019 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
13.05.2019 | Change - representative |