Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11371967 | Global Dossier | 28.06.2022 | B2 | US2019360977 | 28.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1854423 | 25.05.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3572139 | Global Dossier | 27.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1854423 | 25.05.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR3081341 | 16.06.2023 | B1 | FR3081341 | 29.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1854423 | 25.05.2018 |