EP3572139 - FLUID NETWORK FOR CONTROLLING AT LEAST ONE GAS STREAM AND SYSTEM USING SAID NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.10.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2019/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOURLON, Bertrand c/o CEA GRENOBLE 17, rue des Martyrs 38054 GRENOBLE CEDEX 09 / FR | [2019/48] | Representative(s) | INNOV-GROUP 209 Avenue Berthelot 69007 Lyon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/48] | GIE Innovation Competence Group 310, avenue Berthelot 69372 Lyon Cedex 08 / FR | Application number, filing date | 19173926.7 | 10.05.2019 | [2019/48] | Priority number, date | FR20180054423 | 25.05.2018 Original published format: FR 1854423 | [2019/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3572139 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/04, B01D53/26, G01N30/08, G01N30/38, G01N30/88, G01N1/22, G01N1/40, A61B5/08 | [2019/48] | CPC: |
B01D53/0462 (EP);
G01N30/16 (US);
B01D53/261 (EP);
G01N1/2214 (EP);
G01N1/4022 (EP);
G01N1/405 (EP);
G01N30/08 (EP);
B01D2251/302 (EP);
B01D2251/304 (EP);
B01D2253/25 (EP);
B01D2257/91 (EP);
B01D2259/41 (EP);
B01D2259/4558 (EP);
G01N2030/008 (US);
G01N2030/025 (US);
G01N2030/085 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLUIDISCHES NETZWERK ZUR KONTROLLE MINDESTENS EINES GASFLUSSES, UND SYSTEM, DAS EIN SOLCHES NETZWERK VERWENDET | [2019/48] | English: | FLUID NETWORK FOR CONTROLLING AT LEAST ONE GAS STREAM AND SYSTEM USING SAID NETWORK | [2019/48] | French: | RÉSEAU FLUIDIQUE DE CONTRÔLE D'AU MOINS UN FLUX GAZEUX ET SYSTÈME EMPLOYANT LEDIT RÉSEAU | [2019/48] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/48] | 20.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004056016 (TIAN WEI-CHENG [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0074] , [0075] , [0088] , [0089]; figures 1,2,5 *; | [A]US2009211336 (COMBES DAVID J [GB], et al) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [A]US2009308136 (WANG LI-PENG [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * 0036-0039,0058;; figures 1-2,9 *; | [AD] - BASSAM ALFEELI ET AL, "MEMS-Based Selective Preconcentration of Trace Level Breath Analytes", IEEE SENSORS JOURNAL., US, (20090901), vol. 9, no. 9, doi:10.1109/JSEN.2009.2025822, ISSN 1530-437X, pages 1068 - 1075, XP055560477 [AD] 1-14 * Abrégé chapitre "C. Two-Step Preconcentration", pages 1072 à 1073 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSEN.2009.2025822 | [A] - BASSAM ALFEELI ET AL, "Evaluation of Tenax TA thin films as adsorbent material for micro preconcentration applications", MICROCHEMICAL JOURNAL, US, (20100701), vol. 95, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.microc.2009.12.011, ISSN 0026-265X, pages 259 - 267, XP055572002 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.microc.2009.12.011 | by applicant | US2004056016 | US2009308136 | - ALFEELI, B.AGAH, M., "MEMS-Based selective preconcentration of trace level breath analytes", IEEE Sensors Journal, (20090000), vol. 9, no. 5191282, doi:doi:10.1109/JSEN.2009.2025822, pages 1068 - 1075, XP055560477 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSEN.2009.2025822 |