EP3569491 - OUTBOARD MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.05.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | For all designated states Marine Canada Acquisition Inc. 3831 No. 6 Road Richmond, BC V6V 1P6 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2019/47] | For all designated states YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | ||
For all designated states Marine Canada Acquisition Inc. 3831 No. 6 Road Richmond, BC V6V 1P6 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NANJO, Morihiko c/o YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | 02 /
DAVIDSON, Noam Dean c/o MARINE CANADA ACQUISITION INC. 3831 No. 6 Road Richmond, British Columbia V6V 1P6 / CA | 03 /
REDFERN, Richard Tyler c/o MARINE CANADA ACQUISITION INC. 3831 No. 6 Road Richmond, British Columbia V6V 1P6 / CA | 04 /
DYCK, Mark Isaac c/o MARINE CANADA ACQUISITION INC. 3831 No. 6 Road Richmond, British Columbia V6V 1P6 / CA | 05 /
FETCHKO, Eric B. c/o MARINE CANADA ACQUISITION INC. 3831 No. 6 Road Richmond, British Columbia V6V 1P6 / CA | [2019/47] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2019/47] | Application number, filing date | 19174021.6 | 13.05.2019 | [2019/47] | Priority number, date | JP20180092953 | 14.05.2018 Original published format: JP 2018092953 | [2019/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3569491 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3569491 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B63H20/12 | [2019/47] | CPC: |
B63H20/12 (EP,US);
B63H20/06 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/23] |
Former [2019/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AUSSENBORDMOTOR | [2019/47] | English: | OUTBOARD MOTOR | [2019/47] | French: | MOTEUR HORS-BORD | [2019/47] | Examination procedure | 23.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/23] | 23.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.08.2023 | CZ | 16.08.2023 | DK | 16.08.2023 | EE | 16.08.2023 | ES | 16.08.2023 | FI | 16.08.2023 | HR | 16.08.2023 | LT | 16.08.2023 | LV | 16.08.2023 | NL | 16.08.2023 | PL | 16.08.2023 | RO | 16.08.2023 | RS | 16.08.2023 | SE | 16.08.2023 | SI | 16.08.2023 | SK | 16.08.2023 | SM | 16.08.2023 | NO | 16.11.2023 | GR | 17.11.2023 | IS | 16.12.2023 | PT | 18.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/23] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 16.08.2023 | |
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS5945295 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 1-12 * page 2 - page 5; figures 1-7 *; | [A]US7150664 (UPPGARD DARIN C [US], et al) [A] 1-12* column 4, line 24 - column 7, line 67; figures 1-10 *; | [Y]US2007066156 (MIZUTANI MAKOTO [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0042]; figures 1,3 * | Examination | US4228757 | US6402577 | US2015072575 | US9849957 | US2017369140 | by applicant | US7311571 |