EP3739964 - METHOD AND MOBILE NETWORK FOR DYNAMIC NETWORK STEERING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/47] | METHOD FOR DYNAMIC STEERING | ||
[2021/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Telekom AG Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140 53113 Bonn / DE | [2020/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN GRONINGEN, Henri Auf dem Acker 31 53340 Meckenheim / DE | 02 /
PAVLIS, Michal Winkelsweg 40 53175 Bonn / DE | 03 /
WILLOWEIT, Benno Uhlandstraße 4 64297 Darmstadt / DE | 04 /
VON BELOW, Alexander Escher Straße 31e 50733 Köln / DE | 05 /
JOPPICH, Andreas Feldstr. 27 Bonn 53225 / DE | [2020/47] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2020/47] | Application number, filing date | 19174057.0 | 13.05.2019 | [2020/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3739964 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3739964 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/18, // H04W8/12, H04W8/20 | [2020/47] | CPC: |
H04W48/18 (EP);
H04W8/12 (EP);
H04W8/205 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND MOBILFUNKNETZ ZUR DYNAMISCHEN NETZWERKLENKUNG | [2021/01] | English: | METHOD AND MOBILE NETWORK FOR DYNAMIC NETWORK STEERING | [2021/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET RÉSEAU MOBILE DE PILOTAGE DE RÉSEAU DYNAMIQUE | [2021/01] |
Former [2020/47] | VERFAHREN ZUR DYNAMISCHEN LENKUNG | ||
Former [2020/47] | METHOD FOR DYNAMIC STEERING | ||
Former [2020/47] | PROCÉDÉ DE DIRECTION DYNAMIQUE | Examination procedure | 21.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/47] | 21.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/13] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.05.2019 | AL | 21.04.2021 | AT | 21.04.2021 | CY | 21.04.2021 | CZ | 21.04.2021 | DK | 21.04.2021 | EE | 21.04.2021 | FI | 21.04.2021 | HR | 21.04.2021 | LT | 21.04.2021 | LV | 21.04.2021 | MC | 21.04.2021 | MK | 21.04.2021 | MT | 21.04.2021 | NL | 21.04.2021 | PL | 21.04.2021 | RO | 21.04.2021 | RS | 21.04.2021 | SE | 21.04.2021 | SI | 21.04.2021 | SK | 21.04.2021 | SM | 21.04.2021 | TR | 21.04.2021 | IE | 13.05.2021 | LU | 13.05.2021 | BE | 31.05.2021 | BG | 21.07.2021 | NO | 21.07.2021 | GR | 22.07.2021 | IS | 21.08.2021 | PT | 23.08.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 13.05.2019 | |
AL | 21.04.2021 | ||
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
MK | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
TR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 13.05.2021 | ||
LU | 13.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 13.05.2019 | |
AL | 21.04.2021 | ||
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
MK | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 13.05.2021 | ||
LU | 13.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 13.05.2019 | |
AL | 21.04.2021 | ||
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 13.05.2021 | ||
LU | 13.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 13.05.2021 | ||
LU | 13.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 13.05.2021 | ||
LU | 13.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 13.05.2021 | ||
LU | 13.05.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 13.05.2021 | ||
LU | 13.05.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 13.05.2021 | ||
LU | 13.05.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 13.05.2021 | ||
LU | 13.05.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.05.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.05.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.05.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Discussion on PLMN and RAT selection policies for roaming", vol. CT WG1, no. Krakow (Poland); 20170821 - 20170825, (20170820), 3GPP DRAFT; C1-173187, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/CT1/Docs/, (20170820), XP051313228 [A] 1,2 * Section 2 * | [A] - KPN, "Steering of Roaming: new Key Issue", vol. SA WG3, no. La Jolla (US); 20180521 - 20180525, (20180518), 3GPP DRAFT; S3-181855 - STEERING OF ROAMING KI, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings%5F3GPP%5FSYNC/SA3/Docs, (20180518), XP051457126 [A] 1,2 * Sections 3 and 4 * | [A] - CT1, "Reply LS on PLMN and RAT selection policies for roaming", vol. CT WG6, no. Montreal, Canada; 20180227 - 20180302, (20180227), 3GPP DRAFT; C6-180045_C1-180761_REPLY LS ON PLMN AND RAT SELECTION POLICIES FOR ROAMING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fct/WG6%5FSmartcard%5FEx%2DT3/CT6%2D87/Documents/Docs/, (20180227), XP051396678 [A] 1,2 * Section 1 * | by applicant | WO2014055789 |