EP3739905 - EARPIECE FOR THE EAR CANAL WITH OFF-AXIS ELECTRONIC PACKAGE AND RECEIVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sonova AG P.O. Box Patent & Design Rights Team Laubisrütistrasse 28 8712 Stäfa / CH | [2020/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROECK, Hans-Ueli Eichwisstrasse 39 8634 Hombrechtikon / CH | 02 /
LEUTHOLD, Markus Binzstrasse 60 8712 Stäfa / CH | [2020/47] | Application number, filing date | 19174104.0 | 13.05.2019 | [2020/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3739905 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00 | [2020/47] | CPC: |
H04R25/658 (EP);
H04R25/652 (EP);
H04R2225/021 (EP);
H04R2225/023 (EP);
H04R2225/025 (EP);
H04R2225/77 (EP);
H04R25/552 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] |
Former [2020/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OHRSTÜCK MIT NICHT IN EINER ACHSE ANGEORDNETEM ELEKTRONIKGEHÄUSE UND HÖRER IM GEHÖRGANG | [2020/47] | English: | EARPIECE FOR THE EAR CANAL WITH OFF-AXIS ELECTRONIC PACKAGE AND RECEIVER | [2020/47] | French: | ÉCOUTEUR COMPORTANT UN BOÎTIER ÉLECTRONIQUE ET UN RÉCEPTEUR ORDONNES HORS-AXE DANS LE CANAL AUDITIF | [2020/47] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/25] | 18.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2021 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.07.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US6212283 (FLETCHER HENRY [US], et al); | [XI]EP1246507 (WIDEX AS [DK]); | [Y]EP2747455 (STARKEY LAB INC [US]); | [XAYI]US2014270191 (NIKLES PETER [DE]); | [XAI]EP3399775 (SIVANTOS PTE LTD [SG]); | [Y]EP3477968 (STARKEY LABS INC [US]) | by applicant | DE102013001920 |