Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11467563 | Global Dossier | 11.10.2022 | B2 | US2021103271 | 08.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016996428 | 18.08.2020 | US201815983990 | 18.05.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10747205 | Global Dossier | 18.08.2020 | B2 | US2019354085 | 21.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815983990 | 18.05.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110497362 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201815983990 | 18.05.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3570123 | Global Dossier | 20.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815983990 | 18.05.2018 |