EP3570123 - ELECTRONIC TOOL AND METHOD FOR COPYING A PLURALITY OF SETTINGS FROM A MECHANICAL TOOL TO ANOTHER MECHANICAL TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ingersoll-Rand Industrial U.S., Inc. 800-E Beaty Street Davidson, NC 28036 / US | [2020/18] |
Former [2019/47] | For all designated states INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY 800-D Beaty Street Davidson NC 28036 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINEHAN, John J 2719 Brocket Ct. Jamison, PA 18929 / US | 02 /
MURALIDHAR, Ashok 1077 Tullo Farm Rd. Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | 03 /
PILLAY, Manivasagan Krishna No: 136/5, 15th Cross Nagavarapalya 560093 C V Raman Nagar / IN | 04 /
RAO RAO RV, Madhusudhana Flat no: S2, 2nd Floor, 6, 4th Main 4th Cross Papaiah Garden 560093 Banashankari 2nd stage / IN | 05 /
HABIBULLAH, Nfn 935 N 33rd St. Allentown, PA 18104 / US | [2019/47] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/47] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 19174521.5 | 14.05.2019 | [2019/47] | Priority number, date | US201815983990 | 18.05.2018 Original published format: US201815983990 | [2019/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3570123 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/042, B25B23/142, B25F5/00 | [2019/47] | CPC: |
B25B21/00 (EP);
G05B19/4155 (US);
B25B23/1425 (EP);
B25F5/00 (EP,CN);
G05B19/0426 (EP);
G05B2219/25059 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/28] |
Former [2019/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHES WERKZEUG UND VERFAHREN ZUM KOPIEREN VON EINER VIELZAHL VON EINSTELLUNGEN AUS EINEM MECHANISCHEN WERKZEUG ZU EINEM ANDEREN MECHANISCHEN WERKZEUG | [2019/47] | English: | ELECTRONIC TOOL AND METHOD FOR COPYING A PLURALITY OF SETTINGS FROM A MECHANICAL TOOL TO ANOTHER MECHANICAL TOOL | [2019/47] | French: | OUTIL ÉLECTRONIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COPIE D'UNE PLURALITÉ DE PARAMÈTRES D'UN OUTIL MÉCANIQUE VERS UN AUTRE OUTIL MÉCANIQUE | [2019/47] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/28] | 02.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/47] | 30.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2020/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2013102963 (MARSH GENE WESLEY [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,8,9,11,12,16,17 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0072] * * figures 1-8A * [I] 3,5-7,13-15,18-20; | [XI]EP2866106 (RENAULT GEORGES ETS [FR]) [X] 1,2,8-11,16 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0045] * * figures 1-5 * [I] 3-7,12-15,17-20; | [A]US2017083014 (CONRAD COLE A [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0086] * * claims 1-3 ** figure 13 *; | [I]TWI622466B (NITTO KOHKI CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-20 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0071] * * figures 1-5 * |