EP3739201 - METHOD OF MONITORING THE STRUCTURAL INTEGRITY OF THE SUPPORTING STRUCTURE OF A WIND TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S Borupvej 16 7330 Brande / DK | [2020/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoegh, Gustav Nyboesgade, 21, ST, TV 7100 Vejle / DK | 02 /
Jensen, Dennis Stachniuk Fyrrevænget 31 7330 Brande / DK | [2020/47] | Representative(s) | SGRE-Association Siemens Energy Global GmbH & Co. KG SE I IM P Intellectual Property Siemenspromenade 9 91058 Erlangen / DE | [2024/17] |
Former [2020/47] | Aspacher, Karl-Georg Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy GmbH & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19174859.9 | 16.05.2019 | [2020/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3739201 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3739201 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F03D17/00 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
F03D17/0065 (EP);
F03D17/00 (CN,US);
G01M5/0025 (US);
F03D17/011 (EP);
F03D17/034 (EP);
G01H17/00 (CN);
G01P15/18 (US);
G08B21/182 (US);
F05B2240/95 (EP);
F05B2260/966 (EP);
F05B2270/334 (EP);
F05B2270/807 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/47] | F03D13/20, F03D17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] |
Former [2020/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DER STRUKTURELLEN INTEGRITÄT DER TRÄGERSTRUKTUR EINER WINDTURBINE | [2020/47] | English: | METHOD OF MONITORING THE STRUCTURAL INTEGRITY OF THE SUPPORTING STRUCTURE OF A WIND TURBINE | [2020/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SURVEILLANCE DE L'INTÉGRITÉ STRUCTURELLE D'UNE TOUR D'ÉOLIENNE | [2021/29] |
Former [2020/47] | PROCÉDÉ DE SURVEILLANCE DE L'INTÉGRITÉ STRUCTURALE DE LA STRUCTURE DE SUPPORT D'UNE ÉOLIENNE | Examination procedure | 10.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/25] | 17.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1674724 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [A]EP2103915 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [Y]EP3080446 (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK]); | [Y]WO2018001432 (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK]) | Examination | US2009180875 | CN107829884 |