EP3570495 - DEVICE MANAGEMENT METHOD AND RELATED DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.05.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Pinping c/o Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
YE, Yanfei c/o Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2024/25] |
Former [2019/47] | 01 /
LIU, Pinping c/o Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District SHENZHEN, Guangdong 518129 / CN | ||
02 /
YE, Yanfei c/o Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District SHENZHEN, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/47] | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19175035.5 | 17.05.2019 | [2019/47] | Priority number, date | CN201810481644 | 18.05.2018 Original published format: CN201810481644 | [2019/47] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3570495 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L41/0226, H04L41/0213, H04L41/0813, H04L43/0817 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
H04L41/0226 (EP);
H04L41/0213 (EP,CN,US);
G06F9/45558 (US);
H04L41/04 (CN);
H04L41/0803 (CN);
H04L41/0806 (US);
H04L41/0813 (EP);
H04L43/0817 (EP,US);
H04L61/5014 (US);
G06F2009/45595 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/47] | H04L12/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGSVERWALTUNGSVERFAHREN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNG | [2019/47] | English: | DEVICE MANAGEMENT METHOD AND RELATED DEVICE | [2019/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION DE DISPOSITIF ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ | [2019/47] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/47] | 07.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2024 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2006026301 (MAEDA HIDEKI [JP], et al) [I] 1-4,6-9,11-14 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0061] ** paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0078] *; | [XI]US2010287270 (HASHIMOTO HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,10-13,15 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0116] - paragraph [0137]; figure 1 * [I] 4,9,14 |