EP3587840 - DOWEL WITH STRETCHABLE BEAMS SURROUNDED BY EXPANDABLE MATRIX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.01.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Adolf Würth GmbH & Co. KG Reinhold-Würth-Strasse 12-17 74653 Künzelsau / DE | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Würth International AG Aspermontstrasse 1 7000 Chur / CH | [2021/10] |
Former [2020/01] | For all designated states Adolf Würth GmbH & Co. KG Reinhold-Würth-Strasse 12-17 74653 Künzelsau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wieland, Achim Massenbacher Weg 8 74211 Leingarten / DE | [2020/01] | Representative(s) | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | [2020/01] | Application number, filing date | 19175159.3 | 17.05.2019 | [2020/01] | Priority number, date | DE201810115861 | 29.06.2018 Original published format: DE102018115861 | DE201810115862 | 29.06.2018 Original published format: DE102018115862 | DE201920100448U | 25.01.2019 Original published format: DE 202019100448 U | [2020/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3587840 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3587840 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F16B13/12, F16B13/06 | [2020/01] | CPC: |
F16B13/061 (EP);
F16B13/001 (EP);
F16B13/045 (EP);
F16B13/124 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/08] |
Former [2020/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DÜBEL MIT VON DEHNBARER MATRIX UMGEBENEN SPREIZSTEGEN | [2020/01] | English: | DOWEL WITH STRETCHABLE BEAMS SURROUNDED BY EXPANDABLE MATRIX | [2020/01] | French: | CHEVILLE POURVUE DE BRIDES EXPANSIBLES ENTOURÉES DE MATRICE EXTENSIBLE | [2020/01] | Examination procedure | 15.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/08] | 15.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.05.2019 | AL | 05.05.2021 | CY | 05.05.2021 | CZ | 05.05.2021 | DK | 05.05.2021 | EE | 05.05.2021 | HR | 05.05.2021 | LT | 05.05.2021 | LV | 05.05.2021 | MC | 05.05.2021 | MK | 05.05.2021 | MT | 05.05.2021 | RO | 05.05.2021 | RS | 05.05.2021 | SI | 05.05.2021 | SK | 05.05.2021 | SM | 05.05.2021 | IE | 17.05.2021 | LU | 17.05.2021 | BE | 31.05.2021 | BG | 05.08.2021 | NO | 05.08.2021 | GR | 06.08.2021 | IS | 05.09.2021 | PT | 06.09.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 17.05.2019 | |
AL | 05.05.2021 | ||
CY | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
MK | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
IE | 17.05.2021 | ||
LU | 17.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 17.05.2019 | |
AL | 05.05.2021 | ||
CY | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
IE | 17.05.2021 | ||
LU | 17.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
CY | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
IE | 17.05.2021 | ||
LU | 17.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
IE | 17.05.2021 | ||
LU | 17.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
IE | 17.05.2021 | ||
LU | 17.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
IE | 17.05.2021 | ||
LU | 17.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | CZ | 05.05.2021 | |
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
IE | 17.05.2021 | ||
LU | 17.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | CZ | 05.05.2021 | |
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
IE | 17.05.2021 | ||
LU | 17.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | CZ | 05.05.2021 | |
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
LU | 17.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | CZ | 05.05.2021 | |
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
LU | 17.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | CZ | 05.05.2021 | |
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
LU | 17.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | CZ | 05.05.2021 | |
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
LU | 17.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | HR | 05.05.2021 | |
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | HR | 05.05.2021 | |
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | HR | 05.05.2021 | |
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | HR | 05.05.2021 | |
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | LT | 05.05.2021 | |
BG | 05.08.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDI]DE102013107075 (FISCHERWERKE GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [A]EP3175130 (FISCHERWERKE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) | by applicant | DE102013107075 | DE102013107079 |