EP3573087 - MASS SPECTROMETRY DETECTION DEVICE AND MASS SPECTROMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.06.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shimadzu Corporation 1 Nishinokyo-Kuwabaracho Nakagyo-ku Kyoto 604-8511 / JP | [2019/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHICHI, Hideharu c/o Shimadzu Corporation 1, Nishinokyo-Kuwabara-cho Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 6048511 / JP | [2019/48] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/48] | Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 19175252.6 | 17.05.2019 | [2019/48] | Priority number, date | JP20180099701 | 24.05.2018 Original published format: JP 2018099701 | [2019/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3573087 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01J49/02 | [2019/48] | CPC: |
H01J49/025 (EP,US);
H01J49/08 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MASSENSPEKTROMETRIEDETEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG UND MASSENSPEKTROMETER | [2019/48] | English: | MASS SPECTROMETRY DETECTION DEVICE AND MASS SPECTROMETER | [2019/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION DE SPECTROMÉTRIE DE MASSE ET SPECTROMÈTRE DE MASSE | [2019/48] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/48] | 02.06.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/28] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9401206 (ARCH DEV CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * abstract * * figures 1, 13-17 * * page 2, line 27 - page 3, line 18 * * page 7, lines 10-11 * * page 17, lines 23-32 * [I] 3,4; | [XD]JP2012122871 (SHIMADZU CORP) [XD] 1,5 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0017] - [0023] *; | [A]US3317823 (BRODSKY ROBERT S) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * figure 1 * * column 1, lines 10-11 * * column 2, lines 12-37 * * claim 1 *; | [A]US2005199793 (CROYDON WILLIAM F [GB]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0026] - [0030] * * claim 1 *; | [A]US7157681 (TETZLAFF WOLFGANG [US]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * figures 1, 6, 7 * * column 11, line 10 - column 12, line 40 *; | [A]EP0310210 (UTI INSTRUMENTS CO [US]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * column 2, lines 17-35 * * claim 1 * | by applicant | JP2012122871 |