EP3573048 - SYSTEM AND METHOD TO IDENTIFY A SERIAL DISPLAY INTERFACE MALFUNCTION AND PROVIDE REMEDIATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus Building 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2019/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aubineau, Vincent c/o NXP Semiconductors, Intellectual Property Group Abbey House 25 Clarendon Road Redhill, Surrey RH1 1QZ / GB | 02 /
Staudenmaier, Michael Andreas c/o NXP Semiconductors, Intellectual Property Group Abbey House 25 Clarendon Road Redhill, Surrey RH1 1QZ / GB | 03 /
Raileanu, Adrian Victor c/o NXP Semiconductors, Intellectual Property Group Abbey House 25 Clarendon Road Redhill, Surrey RH1 1QZ / GB | [2019/48] | Representative(s) | Miles, John Richard NXP SEMICONDUCTORS Intellectual Property Group Abbey House 25 Clarendon Road Redhill, Surrey RH1 1QZ / GB | [2019/48] | Application number, filing date | 19175430.8 | 20.05.2019 | [2019/48] | Priority number, date | EP20180305633 | 24.05.2018 Original published format: EP 18305633 | [2019/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3573048 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G09G5/00 | [2019/48] | CPC: |
G09G5/006 (EP,US);
G09G5/003 (EP);
G09G2320/0666 (US);
G09G2330/08 (EP,US);
G09G2330/12 (EP,US);
G09G2340/0421 (US);
G09G2350/00 (EP);
G09G2358/00 (EP);
G09G2370/04 (EP);
G09G2370/14 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/27] |
Former [2019/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM IDENTIFIZIEREN EINER SERIELLEN ANZEIGE-SCHNITTSTELLEN-FEHLFUNKTION UND ZUM BEREITSTELLEN EINER FEHLERBEHEBUNG | [2019/48] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD TO IDENTIFY A SERIAL DISPLAY INTERFACE MALFUNCTION AND PROVIDE REMEDIATION | [2019/48] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR IDENTIFIER UN DYSFONCTIONNEMENT D'INTERFACE D'AFFICHAGE EN SÉRIE ET FOURNIR UNE RÉPARATION | [2019/48] | Examination procedure | 26.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/27] | 27.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.07.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2010014620 (ALBU REMUS [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,6,9,11-13,15 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0050] * [Y] 2,8,14 [I] 4,7,10; | [Y]US2013113777 (BAEK DONG-HOON [KR], et al) [Y] 2,14 * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0070] *; | [Y]US2013235039 (MONTAG BRUCE C [US]) [Y] 8 * paragraph [0003] ** paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0029] * |