EP3610723 - ANIMAL HEALTH AND WELLNESS MONITORING USING UWB RADAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.12.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states i4c Innovations Inc. 3800 Concorde Parkway Suite 400 Chantilly, VA 20151 / US | [2020/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TUPIN, Joe Paul Jr. 12882 Falcon Point Place Truckee, CA 96161 / US | 02 /
COUSE, John Michael 3800 Concorde Parkway Suite 400 Chantilly, VA 20151 / US | [2020/08] | Representative(s) | Suckling, Andrew Michael Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/08] | Suckling, Andrew Michael Marks & Clerk LLP Fletcher House The Oxford Science Park Heatley Road Oxford OX4 4GE / GB | Application number, filing date | 19175466.2 | 09.05.2014 | [2020/08] | Priority number, date | US201314086721 | 21.11.2013 Original published format: US201314086721 | [2020/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3610723 | Date: | 19.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A01K27/00, A61B5/024, A61B5/08, A61B5/11, A61B5/00, A01K29/00, A61B5/0205, A61B5/05, G01S13/88 | [2020/08] | CPC: |
A01K29/005 (EP,US);
A01K27/009 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/0205 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/02438 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/0507 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/0816 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/1107 (EP,US);
A61B5/6822 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/6831 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/08] | Title | German: | ÜBERWACHUNG DER TIERGESUNDHEIT UND DES TIERWOHLBEFINDENS MITTELS UWB-RADAR | [2020/08] | English: | ANIMAL HEALTH AND WELLNESS MONITORING USING UWB RADAR | [2020/08] | French: | SURVEILLANCE DE LA SANTÉ ET DU BIEN-ÊTRE D'UN ANIMAL AU MOYEN D'UN RADAR UWB | [2020/08] | Examination procedure | 20.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/04] | 09.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/04] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14733000.5 / EP3071023 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2020 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2008057883 (BIANCAMED LTD [IE], et al) [X] 1-3,5-11,14 * page 7 - page 13; figures 1,2,6,7 * [I] 4,12,13; | [XI]US2011060215 (TUPIN JR JOE PAUL [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5-8 * abstract * [I] 4; | [X]DE102009040198 (KARLSRUHER INST TECHNOLOGIE [DE]) [X] 1,5-8* paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0004]; figures 1,2 *; | [XI]WO2013118121 (BARAK ILAN SAUL [IL]) [X] 1,2,5,7-10 * page 13 - page 15; figures 3,4,7 * [I] 4,6,12-14 | by applicant | US7725150 | US8463361 |