blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3569927

EP3569927 - BURNER DEVICE WITH PULSED AIR/GAS PRE-MIX [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.05.2024
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.06.2023
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.02.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.06.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  18.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.01.2025Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 12.02.2025  [2025/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Yahtec
36, Rue Pascal
77100 Meaux / FR
[2019/47]
Inventor(s)01 / CAZARD, Yves
46bis rue de la Côte Fleurie
77660 Saint-Jean-les-deux-Jumeaux / FR
 [2019/47]
Representative(s)Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon
4a rue de l'Industrie
67450 Mundolsheim / FR
[2019/47]
Application number, filing date19175468.820.05.2019
[2019/47]
Priority number, dateFR2018007057718.05.2018         Original published format: FR 1870577
FR2018005763724.08.2018         Original published format: FR 1857637
[2019/47]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3569927
Date:20.11.2019
Language:FR
[2019/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3569927
Date:26.07.2023
Language:FR
[2023/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.09.2019
ClassificationIPC:F23D14/36, F23D14/58, F23D14/70
[2019/47]
CPC:
F23D14/36 (EP); F23D14/58 (EP); F23D14/70 (EP);
F23D14/74 (EP); F24H3/006 (EP); F23N2241/02 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/28]  
Former [2019/47]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:BRENNERVORRICHTUNG MIT GEPULSTER LUFT/GAS-VORMISCHUNG[2019/47]
English:BURNER DEVICE WITH PULSED AIR/GAS PRE-MIX[2019/47]
French:DISPOSITIF DE BRULEUR À PRÉ-MÉLANGE AIR/GAZ PULSÉ[2019/47]
Examination procedure02.06.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.06.2020Examination requested  [2020/28]
02.06.2020Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.02.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.06.2023Fee for grant paid
20.06.2023Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.06.2023Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)29.04.2024No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.05.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.2022Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2023Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ26.07.2023
ES26.07.2023
HR26.07.2023
MC26.07.2023
PL26.07.2023
RO26.07.2023
RS26.07.2023
SK26.07.2023
SM26.07.2023
NO26.10.2023
GR27.10.2023
IS26.11.2023
[2025/07]
Former [2024/23]CZ26.07.2023
ES26.07.2023
HR26.07.2023
PL26.07.2023
RO26.07.2023
RS26.07.2023
SK26.07.2023
SM26.07.2023
NO26.10.2023
GR27.10.2023
IS26.11.2023
Former [2024/20]HR26.07.2023
PL26.07.2023
RS26.07.2023
SM26.07.2023
NO26.10.2023
GR27.10.2023
IS26.11.2023
Former [2024/10]HR26.07.2023
PL26.07.2023
RS26.07.2023
NO26.10.2023
GR27.10.2023
IS26.11.2023
Former [2024/09]NO26.10.2023
GR27.10.2023
IS26.11.2023
Former [2024/08]NO26.10.2023
GR27.10.2023
Documents cited:Search[A]US3051464  (YEO ROBERT H, et al) [A] 1 * column 8, line 10 - line 73 ** figures 1-3 *;
 [Y]EP0560454  (FLAMECO ECLIPSE BV [NL]) [Y] 1-3 * column 1, line 44 - line 56 * * column 5, line 42 - column 6, line 52 * * column 7, line 25 - line 38 * * column 8, line 21 - column 9, line 24 * * figures 1-2C,4C *;
 [A]US6921261  (PERRY DOUGLAS M [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 6 - line 67 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]EP2899463  (CALEDONIAN CONTROL TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-3 * column 5, paragraph 22 - paragraph 25 * * figure 1 *;
 [Y]EP2947388  (KYUNGDONG NAVIEN CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-3 * column 5, paragraph 24 * * column 8, paragraph 37 - column 9, paragraph 43 * * figures 2,10 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.