EP3742057 - HEAT RECOVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Georg Fischer JRG AG Hauptstrasse 130 4450 Sissach / CH | [2020/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bürli, Stephan Hofmattweg 21 4402 Frenkendorf / CH | 02 /
Cachot, Philippe Hofstettenweg 9a 4450 Sissach / CH | [2020/48] | Representative(s) | Fenner, Seraina Georg Fischer AG Amsler-Laffon-Strasse 9 8201 Schaffhausen / CH | [2020/48] | Application number, filing date | 19175696.4 | 21.05.2019 | [2020/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3742057 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F24D17/00, F24D19/10, F28D7/10 | [2020/48] | CPC: |
F16L9/18 (EP);
F24D19/1051 (EP,US);
F16L59/143 (EP);
F16L59/147 (EP);
F24D17/0026 (EP);
F24D17/0052 (EP);
F24D17/0084 (EP);
F28D21/0012 (EP);
F28D7/106 (EP);
F24D2200/12 (EP);
F24D2200/16 (EP);
F28F2270/00 (EP);
Y02B10/70 (EP);
Y02B30/18 (EP);
Y02B30/52 (EP);
Y02B30/56 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/21] |
Former [2020/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMERÜCKGEWINNUNG | [2020/48] | English: | HEAT RECOVERY | [2020/48] | French: | RÉCUPÉRATION DE CHALEUR | [2020/48] | Examination procedure | 15.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/21] | 15.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3308447 (HAKEMANN WILHELM) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3830594 (BECK WOLFGANG [DE]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [XAI]WO9835178 (KROENER JOSEF [DE]) [X] 1,3-8,10,12 * page 12; figures 2, 5, 7 * [A] 2,9 [I] 11; | [XAI]EP1081438 (KEMPER GEBR GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,3-8,10,12 * paragraphs [0008] - [0018]; figures 1-5 * [A] 2,9 [I] 11; | [A]WO2012025095 (SPIEGEL HERBERT [DE]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2461100 (VAILLANT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [A]EP3339750 (ESG ENERGIE SYSTEM GEBAEUDE AG [CH]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | by applicant | GB2528173 |