EP3742134 - CIRCUIT AND METHOD FOR RATIOMETRIC LIGHT CHANGE DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMEC VZW Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | For all designated states Stichting IMEC Nederland High Tech Campus 31 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2022/01] |
Former [2020/48] | For all designated states IMEC VZW Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | ||
For all designated states Stichting IMEC Nederland High Tech Campus 31 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | |||
For all designated states Universiteit Gent Sint-Pietersnieuwstraat 25 9000 Gent / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN LIEMPD, Chris Stichting IMEC Nederland c/o IMEC VZW Patent Department Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | 02 /
VASQUEZ QUINTERO, Andres Felipe IMEC VZW c/o IMEC VZW Patent Department Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | 03 /
DE SMET, Herbert IMEC VZW c/o IMEC VZW Patent Department Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | [2020/48] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [2023/48] |
Former [2020/48] | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 19176095.8 | 23.05.2019 | [2020/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3742134 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3742134 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01J1/44, G02C7/04, G01J1/42, G02C11/00 | [2023/02] | CPC: |
G01J1/44 (EP,CN,IL,US);
G02C7/04 (EP,CN,IL,US);
G02C11/10 (EP,CN,IL);
G02C7/046 (CN);
G02C7/047 (CN);
G02C7/101 (US);
G02F1/13312 (US);
G02F1/137 (US);
G01J2001/4242 (EP,IL);
|
Former IPC [2020/48] | G01J1/44, G02C7/04, G01J1/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/26] |
Former [2020/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHALTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR RATIOMETRISCHEN LICHTÄNDERUNGSERKENNUNG | [2020/48] | English: | CIRCUIT AND METHOD FOR RATIOMETRIC LIGHT CHANGE DETECTION | [2020/48] | French: | CIRCUIT ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE CHANGEMENT DE LUMIÈRE RATIOMÉTRIQUE | [2020/48] | Examination procedure | 24.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/26] | 24.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.11.2023 | CZ | 29.11.2023 | EE | 29.11.2023 | HR | 29.11.2023 | LT | 29.11.2023 | LV | 29.11.2023 | PL | 29.11.2023 | RO | 29.11.2023 | RS | 29.11.2023 | SK | 29.11.2023 | SM | 29.11.2023 | BG | 29.02.2024 | GR | 01.03.2024 | IS | 29.03.2024 | PT | 01.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 29.11.2023 | |
CZ | 29.11.2023 | ||
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RO | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | HR | 29.11.2023 | |
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HR | 29.11.2023 | |
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | HR | 29.11.2023 | |
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 29.11.2023 | |
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 01.03.2024 | |
IS | 29.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5737221 (RICOH KK); | [I]US5155353 (PAHR PER O [NO]); | [A]US5498865 (GABOURY MICHAEL J [US], et al); | [XY]EP1970732 (SUISSE ELECTRONIQUE MICROTECH [CH]); | [A]EP3125021 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON VISION CARE [US]); | [Y]WO2017058401 (VERILY LIFE SCIENCES LLC [US]); | [Y]WO2018111992 (SPY EYE LLC [US]) |