EP3599447 - DIELECTRIC-CONSTANT-INSENSITIVE FLUID LEVEL SENSOR FOR DIRECTLY INSERTING INTO A HIGH DIELECTRIC CONSTANT FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sensata Technologies, Inc. 529 Pleasant Street Attleboro, MA 02703 / US | [2020/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANNA, Tyler S. 529 Pleasant Street Attleboro, MA Massachusetts 02703 / US | 02 /
TADAS, Harshad V. 529 Pleasant Street Attleboro, MA Massachusetts 02703 / US | 03 /
LEGENDRE, Andrew 529 Pleasant Street Attleboro, MA Massachusetts 02703 / US | 04 /
GUBANOV, Nikita 529 Pleasant Street Attleboro, MA Massachusetts 02703 / US | [2020/05] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/05] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | Application number, filing date | 19176159.2 | 23.05.2019 | [2020/05] | Priority number, date | US201816043749 | 24.07.2018 Original published format: US201816043749 | [2020/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3599447 | Date: | 29.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3599447 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01F23/263, G01F23/00, G01F23/04 | [2022/07] | CPC: |
G01F23/0046 (EP,US);
G01F23/266 (KR,US);
G01F23/263 (CN,US);
G01F23/268 (EP,US);
G01F23/04 (EP,US);
G01F23/265 (US);
G01F23/261 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/05] | G01F23/00, G01F23/04, G01F23/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/36] |
Former [2020/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DIELEKTRIZITÄTSKONSTANTEN-UNEMPFINDLICHER FLÜSSIGKEITSPEGELSENSOR ZUM DIREKTEN EINFÜHREN IN EINE FLÜSSIGKEIT MIT HOHER DIELEKTRIZITÄTSKONSTANTE | [2020/05] | English: | DIELECTRIC-CONSTANT-INSENSITIVE FLUID LEVEL SENSOR FOR DIRECTLY INSERTING INTO A HIGH DIELECTRIC CONSTANT FLUID | [2020/05] | French: | CAPTEUR DE NIVEAU DE FLUIDE INSENSIBLE À LA CONSTANTE DIÉLECTRIQUE POUR INSERTION DIRECTE DANS UN FLUIDE À CONSTANTE DIÉLECTRIQUE ÉLEVÉE | [2020/05] | Examination procedure | 28.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/36] | 28.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.04.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 06.07.2022 | AT | 06.07.2022 | CZ | 06.07.2022 | DK | 06.07.2022 | EE | 06.07.2022 | ES | 06.07.2022 | FI | 06.07.2022 | HR | 06.07.2022 | IT | 06.07.2022 | LT | 06.07.2022 | LV | 06.07.2022 | MC | 06.07.2022 | NL | 06.07.2022 | PL | 06.07.2022 | RO | 06.07.2022 | RS | 06.07.2022 | SE | 06.07.2022 | SI | 06.07.2022 | SK | 06.07.2022 | SM | 06.07.2022 | NO | 06.10.2022 | GR | 07.10.2022 | IS | 06.11.2022 | PT | 07.11.2022 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 06.07.2022 | |
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 06.07.2022 | |
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 06.07.2022 | |
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 06.07.2022 | |
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | ES | 06.07.2022 | |
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | ES | 06.07.2022 | |
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 06.07.2022 | |
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 06.07.2022 | |
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 06.07.2022 | |
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | NL | 06.07.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002008526 (MARTIN BARRY E [US], et al) [X] 11,12 * figure 1 * * [0021],[0022],[0024],[0025],[0027] *; | [I]JP2006214997 (KI SHOSAI, et al) [I] 1-15 * figures 2,4,6 * * [0017],[0019],[0020],[0032] *; | [A]DE102005007221 (HOFFMEIER BENJAMIN [DE]) [A] 6,7,9,11-15* figure 1 *; | [I]KR20130095869 (SAMSUNG TECHWIN CO LTD [KR]) [I] 1 * figures 3(a),4 * * [0002],[0033]-[0035],[0038] * |