EP3598163 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING LOCATION ACCURACY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Straße 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [2020/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hamer, Henning Sommerstraße 9 81543 München / DE | 02 /
Mattmüller, Karsten Im Fuhrtal 38 93133 Burglengenfeld / DE | 03 /
Hamperl, Helmut Alter Schulweg 13 93413 Cham / DE | 04 /
Karn, Holger Chemin de Ferret 3BIS 31170 Tournefeuille / FR | [2020/04] | Representative(s) | Continental Corporation c/o Continental Automotive Technologies GmbH Intellectual Property Guerickestraße 7 60488 Frankfurt a. Main / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 19176313.5 | 23.05.2019 | [2020/04] | Priority number, date | DE201810212133 | 20.07.2018 Original published format: DE102018212133 | [2020/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3598163 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/00, G01C21/36, // G01S5/02 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
G01S5/0036 (EP);
G01S19/485 (EP,US);
G01C11/06 (US);
G01C21/30 (EP);
G01C21/3602 (US);
G01S5/02521 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/35] |
Former [2020/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR GENAUIGKEITSSTEIGERUNG EINER ORTSBESTIMMUNG | [2020/04] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING LOCATION ACCURACY | [2020/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'AUGMENTATION DE LA PRÉCISION D'UNE LOCALISATION | [2020/04] | Examination procedure | 19.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/35] | 22.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 03.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/26] | 23.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US9103671 (BREED DAVID S [US], et al) [X] 1,5,6,8-12 * column 7, line 23 - column 70, line 6 * * figures 1-17 * * abstract * [I] 2-4,7; | [A]WO2017025600 (CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12 * page 31, line 36 - page 50, line 8 * * figures 1-20 ** abstract *; | [A]US2018151071 (PARK JONG ROK [KR], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 3, paragraph 37 - page 6, paragraph 87 * * figures 1-8 * * abstract *; | [XI]DE102017129501 (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [X] 1-6,8-12 * page 2, paragraph 2 - page 9, paragraph 44 * * figures 1-6 * * abstract * [I] 7 |