Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11820086 | Global Dossier | 21.11.2023 | B2 | US2020086589 | 19.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018173065 | 14.09.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20200031506 | Global Dossier | 24.03.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018173065 | 14.09.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7193282B | Global Dossier | 20.12.2022 | B2 | JP2020044675 | 26.03.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018173065 | 14.09.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110901104B | Global Dossier | 16.12.2022 | B | CN110901104 | 24.03.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018173065 | 14.09.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3623141 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2024 | C0 | EP3623141 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2024 | B1 | EP3623141 | 18.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018173065 | 14.09.2018 |