EP3623141 - PREFORM SHAPING METHOD AND COMPOSITE FORMING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Unitary effect registered Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for unitary effect filed Status updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Decision on the request for unitary effect | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Proprietor(s) | For all participating member states Subaru Corporation 1-20-8, Ebisu Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-8554 / JP | [2024/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEKINE, Naoyuki c/o Subaru Corporation 1-20-8, Ebisu, Shibuya-ku Tokyo, 150-8554 / JP | 02 /
INOUE, Yuta c/o Subaru Corporation 1-20-8, Ebisu, Shibuya-ku Tokyo, 150-8554 / JP | [2020/12] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2024/36] | Application number, filing date | 19176335.8 | 24.05.2019 | [2020/12] | Procedural language | EN | (Principal) place of business Tooltip on the date of filing | Principal place of businessTooltip | Unitary Patent Protection | 24.07.2024 | Date of request for unitary effect [2024/35] | 31.07.2024 | Decision on the request for unitary effect: Positive [2024/36] | 31.07.2024 | Date of registration [2024/36] | 24.07.2024 | Date of legal effect [2024/36] | Member States covered by Unitary Tooltip Patent Protection | 31.07.2024 | AT, BE, BG, DE, DK, EE, FI, FR, IT, LT, LU, LV, MT, NL, PT, SE, SI [2024/36] | Publication | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3623141 | Date: | 24.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/30] |