EP3741233 - AEROSOL DELIVERY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 16.04.2021 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NERUDIA LIMITED Wellington House Physics Road Speke Liverpool Merseyside L24 9HP / GB | [2020/48] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2020/48] | Application number, filing date | 19176400.0 | 24.05.2019 | [2020/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3741233 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A24F47/00 | [2020/48] | CPC: |
A24F40/30 (EP);
A24F42/20 (EP);
A24F42/60 (EP);
A24F40/10 (EP);
A24F40/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AEROSOLABGABEVORRICHTUNG | [2020/48] | English: | AEROSOL DELIVERY DEVICE | [2020/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION D'AÉROSOL | [2020/48] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2021/20] | 28.12.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2018169355 (REEVELL TONY [GB]) [X] 1-11,13 * paragraph [0109] - paragraph [0120]; figures 3,4 * [Y] 14,15 [I] 14,15; | [XYI]US2015282529 (LI YONGHAI [CN], et al) [X] 1-6,8,9,12,13 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0034]; figures 2,3 * [Y] 14,15 [I] 14,15; | [XYI]WO2016118005 (UTVG GLOBAL IP B V [NL]) [X] 1-11,13 * page 14, lines 28-35; figure 1+7A * [Y] 14,15 [I] 14,15; | [XY]WO2015123831 (KIMREE HI TECH INC) [X] 1-6,8,11-15 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0083]; figures 1,3,4 * [Y] 14,15; | [XYI]CN205648929U (SHENZHEN BUDDY TECH DEV CO LTD) [X] 1-3,11,13 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0042]; figures 3,4 * [Y] 14,15 [I] 14,15 |