EP3614117 - VIBRATION LOAD FOR VIBRATION TESTING OF A SHAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Prisma Engineering Maschinen- und Motorentechnik GmbH Liebenauer Hauptstraße 82C 8041 Graz / AT | [2020/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GSCHWEITL, Ernst Postelgraben 43 8200 Gleisdorf / AT | [2020/09] | Representative(s) | Weiser & Voith Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Kopfgasse 7 1130 Wien / AT | [2020/09] | Application number, filing date | 19176507.2 | 24.05.2019 | [2020/09] | Priority number, date | AT20180050709 | 21.08.2018 Original published format: AT 507092018 | [2020/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3614117 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01M7/02, F16B4/00 | [2020/09] | CPC: |
F16B4/002 (EP,AT);
G01M7/027 (EP,AT);
F16D1/09 (AT);
F16D2001/0906 (AT)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHWINGLAST ZUM SCHWINGUNGSPRÜFEN EINER WELLE | [2020/09] | English: | VIBRATION LOAD FOR VIBRATION TESTING OF A SHAFT | [2020/09] | French: | CHARGE OSCILLANTE DESTINÉE À L'ESSAI DE RÉSISTANCE AUX OSCILLATIONS D'UN ARBRE | [2020/09] | Examination procedure | 27.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/07] | 16.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US3937103 (KLEINHANS SIEGFRIED) [X] 1-3,12,13 * figure 1 * [A] 10 [Y] 9 [I] 4; | [XAYI]JPS58160027 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1,2,11 * figure 4 * [A] 10 [Y] 9 [I] 4; | [XAYI]US2012093579 (YANAGISAWA EIICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5,11 * figure 1B * [A] 10 [Y] 9 [I] 4,6-8; | [YDA]EP3255403 (PRISMA ENG MASCHINEN- UND MOTORENTECHNIK GMBH [AT]) [YD] 9 * figures 1,3 *[A] 10 | by applicant | AT518412B | EP3255403 |