EP3588577 - TRANSISTOR CONTACT AREA ENHANCEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.07.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTEL Corporation 2200 Mission College Blvd. Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2020/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEHANDRU, Rishabh 4606 SW 42nd Place Portland, OR 97221 / US | 02 /
GHANI, Tahir 14191 NW Stonebridge Drive Portland, OR 97229 / US | 03 /
CEA, Stephen 3742 NW 3rd Avenue Hillsboro, OR 97124 / US | [2020/01] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/01] | HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 19176624.5 | 24.05.2019 | [2020/01] | Priority number, date | US201816024724 | 29.06.2018 Original published format: US201816024724 | [2020/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3588577 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/66, H01L29/417, H01L29/78 | [2020/01] | CPC: |
H01L29/66803 (EP);
H01L29/78 (CN);
H01L29/785 (EP,US);
H01L29/0603 (CN);
H01L29/0653 (US);
H01L29/0684 (CN);
H01L29/0692 (CN);
H01L29/0847 (US);
H01L29/105 (US);
H01L29/41791 (EP,US);
H01L29/66795 (EP,US);
H01L29/7855 (CN);
H01L2029/7858 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/32] |
Former [2020/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRANSISTORKONTAKTFLÄCHENERHÖHUNG | [2020/01] | English: | TRANSISTOR CONTACT AREA ENHANCEMENT | [2020/01] | French: | AMÉLIORATION DE ZONE DE CONTACT DE TRANSISTOR | [2020/01] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/32] | 01.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.11.2024 | 30.08.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 13.11.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2010045087 (MICRON TECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al); | [A]US9385140 (MCMULLAN RUSSELL CARLTON [US]); | [A]US2016353038 (MADURAWE RAMINDA [US], et al); | [A]WO2017111864 (INTEL CORP [US]); | [I]WO2018039645 (INTEL CORP [US]) |