EP3744490 - HANDLE ASSEMBLY AND RECYCLING PROCESS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIC Violex Single Member S.A. 58, Aghiou Athanasiou Street 14569 Anoixi / GR | [2022/21] |
Former [2020/49] | For all designated states Bic Violex S.A. 58 Ag. Athanasiou Str. Anixi Attikis 14569 Greece / GR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OVVADIAS, Nikolaos C/O BIC VIOLEX IP department 58, AGIOU ATHANASIOU ST. 14569 ANOIXI / GR | 02 /
STAMOULIS, Vasileios C/O BIC VIOLEX IP department 58, AGIOU ATHANASIOU ST. 14569 ANOIXI / GR | 03 /
CHRISTOFIDELLIS, Stratos C/O BIC VIOLEX IP department 58, AGIOU ATHANASIOU ST. 14569 ANOIXI / GR | 04 /
PASPATIS, Georgios C/O BIC VIOLEX IP department 58, AGIOU ATHANASIOU ST. 14569 ANOIXI / GR | [2020/49] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2020/49] | Application number, filing date | 19177434.8 | 29.05.2019 | [2020/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3744490 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3744490 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B26B21/52 | [2020/49] | CPC: |
B26B21/528 (EP,KR,US);
B26B21/522 (EP,KR,US);
B26B21/52 (CN);
B26B21/521 (US);
B26B21/14 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/27] |
Former [2020/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GRIFFANORDNUNG UND RECYCLINGVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2020/49] | English: | HANDLE ASSEMBLY AND RECYCLING PROCESS THEREFOR | [2020/49] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE POIGNÉE ET PROCÉDÉ DE RECYCLAGE ASSOCIÉ | [2020/49] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/27] | 02.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 09.11.2022 | AT | 09.11.2022 | CZ | 09.11.2022 | DK | 09.11.2022 | EE | 09.11.2022 | ES | 09.11.2022 | FI | 09.11.2022 | HR | 09.11.2022 | IT | 09.11.2022 | LT | 09.11.2022 | LV | 09.11.2022 | MC | 09.11.2022 | NL | 09.11.2022 | PL | 09.11.2022 | RO | 09.11.2022 | RS | 09.11.2022 | SE | 09.11.2022 | SI | 09.11.2022 | SK | 09.11.2022 | SM | 09.11.2022 | NO | 09.02.2023 | GR | 10.02.2023 | IS | 09.03.2023 | PT | 09.03.2023 | IE | 29.05.2023 | LU | 29.05.2023 | BE | 31.05.2023 | CH | 31.05.2023 | LI | 31.05.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
MC | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SI | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
IE | 29.05.2023 | ||
LU | 29.05.2023 | ||
BE | 31.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
MC | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SI | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
IE | 29.05.2023 | ||
LU | 29.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
MC | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SI | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
LU | 29.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
MC | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SI | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
LU | 29.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SI | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 09.11.2022 | |
NO | 09.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5784790 (CARSON III WILLIAM C [US], et al) [A] 1-15* figure 3 *; | [XA]US2004216311 (FOLLO THOMAS A [US]) [X] 1-5,9-15 * paragraphs [0004] - [0006] * * paragraphs [0015] - [0021] * * figures 1-3 * [A] 6-8; | [XA]US2012311865 (HAMILTON HAYDEN [US], et al) [X] 1,15 * figure 5 * [A] 2-14; | [AD]US2018043553 (LU HONG [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6749788 | US2018043553 |