EP3586816 - COSMETIC PRODUCT COMPRISING A COSMETIC OR DERMATOLOGICAL PRODUCT CONTAINING VISIBLE BEADS SUSPENDED IN A TRANSPARENT, LIQUID OR GEL CARRIER, WHEREIN THE BEADS ENCAPSULATE A COSMETIC OR DERMATOLOGICAL ACTIVE INGREDIENT WHICH CREATE AN UNPLEASANT ODOUR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2023 [2023/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beiersdorf AG Unnastraße 48 20253 Hamburg / DE | [2021/35] |
Former [2020/01] | For all designated states Beiersdorf AG Unnastraße 48 20253 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bölke, Dana Bilser Straße 27 22297 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
Appel, Brigitte Pommernweg 20 a 22455 Hamburg / DE | [2020/01] | Representative(s) | Beiersdorf AG Patentabteilung Unnastraße 48 20245 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 19178005.5 | 04.06.2019 | [2020/01] | Priority number, date | DE201810210184 | 22.06.2018 Original published format: DE102018210184 | [2020/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3586816 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/11, A61K8/9789, A61K8/73, A61Q19/00, A61Q19/08 | [2020/01] | CPC: |
A61K8/9789 (EP);
A61K8/11 (EP);
A61K8/733 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP);
A61Q19/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/32] |
Former [2020/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOSMETISCHES PRODUKT, UMFASSEND KOSMETISCHES ODER DERMATOLOGISCHES PRODUKT, ENTHALTEND SICHTBARE, IN EINEM TRANSPARENTEN, FLÜSSIGEN ODER GELFÖRMIGEN TRÄGER SUSPENDIERTE PERLEN, WOBEI DIE PERLEN EINEN UNANGENEHMEN EIGENGERUCH ENTWICKELNDEN KOSMETISCHEN ODER DERMATOLOGISCHEN WIRKSTOFF VERKAPSELN | [2020/01] | English: | COSMETIC PRODUCT COMPRISING A COSMETIC OR DERMATOLOGICAL PRODUCT CONTAINING VISIBLE BEADS SUSPENDED IN A TRANSPARENT, LIQUID OR GEL CARRIER, WHEREIN THE BEADS ENCAPSULATE A COSMETIC OR DERMATOLOGICAL ACTIVE INGREDIENT WHICH CREATE AN UNPLEASANT ODOUR | [2020/01] | French: | PRODUIT COSMÉTIQUE COMPRENANT UN PRODUIT COSMÉTIQUE OU DERMATOLOGIQUE CONTENANT DES PERLES VISIBLES, SUSPENDUES DANS UN SUPPORT TRANSPARENT, LIQUIDE OU GÉLIFIÉ, LES PERLES ENCAPSULANT UNE SUBSTANCE ACTIVE COSMÉTIQUE OU DERMATOLOGIQUE DÉVELOPPANT UNE PROPRE ODEUR DÉSAGRÉABLE | [2020/01] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/32] | 01.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/39] | 19.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/39] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 28.10.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 28.10.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.11.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2942045 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [X] 1-15 * claims 1-2 * * examples A-E, 1-8 * * paragraphs [0002] , [ 0006] , [ 0118] , [ 0120] , [ 0131] , [ 0139] - [0143] *; | [X]DE102014208440 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [X] 1-15 * claims 1-9 * * examples A-E, 1-8 * * pages 17-18 ** paragraphs [0002] , [ 0006] , [ 0107] , [ 0109] , [ 0120] * | by applicant | DE3309850 | JPS58180410 | DE4424998 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 155633-54-8 |