EP3564671 - DIAGNOSTIC TESTS AND METHODS FOR ASSESSING SAFETY, EFFICACY OR OUTCOME OF ALLERGEN-SPECIFIC IMMUNOTHERAPY (SIT) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | [2021/39] |
Former [2019/45] | For all designated states Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, NY 10591-6706 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANCOPOULOS, George D. 1519 Baptist Church Road Yorktown Heights, NY 10598 / US | 02 /
ORENGO, Jamie 17 Maple Moor Lane Cortlandt Manor, NY 10567 / US | [2019/45] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/45] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19178233.3 | 22.08.2014 | [2019/45] | Priority number, date | US201361869214P | 23.08.2013 Original published format: US 201361869214 P | [2019/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3564671 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3564671 | Date: | 29.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/50 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
G01N33/6854 (EP,US);
A61K49/0008 (US);
G01N33/502 (EP,US);
G01N33/5088 (US);
G01N2800/24 (US);
G01N2800/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/24] |
Former [2019/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DIAGNOSTISCHE TESTS UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEURTEILUNG DER SICHERHEIT, DER WIRKSAMKEIT ODER DES ERGEBNISSES EINER ALLERGENSPEZIFISCHEN IMMUNTHERAPIE (SIT) | [2019/45] | English: | DIAGNOSTIC TESTS AND METHODS FOR ASSESSING SAFETY, EFFICACY OR OUTCOME OF ALLERGEN-SPECIFIC IMMUNOTHERAPY (SIT) | [2019/45] | French: | TESTS DE DIAGNOSTIC ET PROCÉDÉS D'ÉVALUATION DE LA SÉCURITÉ, DE L'EFFICACITÉ OU DU RÉSULTAT D'UNE IMMUNOTHÉRAPIE SPÉCIFIQUE AUX ALLERGÈNES (SIT) | [2019/45] | Examination procedure | 04.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/24] | 04.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14761497.8 / EP3036543 | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.08.2014 | AL | 29.09.2021 | AT | 29.09.2021 | CY | 29.09.2021 | CZ | 29.09.2021 | DK | 29.09.2021 | EE | 29.09.2021 | ES | 29.09.2021 | FI | 29.09.2021 | HR | 29.09.2021 | IT | 29.09.2021 | LT | 29.09.2021 | LV | 29.09.2021 | MC | 29.09.2021 | MK | 29.09.2021 | NL | 29.09.2021 | PL | 29.09.2021 | RO | 29.09.2021 | RS | 29.09.2021 | SE | 29.09.2021 | SI | 29.09.2021 | SK | 29.09.2021 | SM | 29.09.2021 | BG | 29.12.2021 | NO | 29.12.2021 | GR | 30.12.2021 | IS | 29.01.2022 | PT | 31.01.2022 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/21] | HU | 22.08.2014 | |
AL | 29.09.2021 | ||
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CY | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
IT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
SM | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 22.08.2014 | |
AL | 29.09.2021 | ||
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
IT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/16] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
IT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
IT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 29.09.2021 | |
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 29.09.2021 | |
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 29.09.2021 | |
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | FI | 29.09.2021 | |
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 29.09.2021 | |
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 29.09.2021 | |
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 29.09.2021 | |
NO | 29.12.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - P. A. WÜRTZEN ET AL, "A double-blind placebo-controlled birch allergy vaccination study II: correlation between inhibition of IgE binding, histamine release and facilitated allergen presentation", CLINICAL & EXPERIMENTAL ALLERGY, (20080801), vol. 38, no. 8, doi:10.1111/j.1365-2222.2008.03020.x, ISSN 0954-7894, pages 1290 - 1301, XP055154245 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * * In particular: Title; Abstract; Materials and methods section; Fig. 1. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2222.2008.03020.x | [A] - CHRISTIAN MÖBS ET AL, "Birch pollen immunotherapy results in long-term loss of Bet v 1-specific TH2 responses, transient TR1 activation, and synthesis of IgE-blocking antibodies", JOURNAL OF ALLERGY AND CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, (20121101), vol. 130, no. 5, doi:10.1016/j.jaci.2012.07.056, ISSN 0091-6749, pages 1108 - 1116.e6, XP055154058 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * * In particular: Title; Abstract; Methods section (online repository at the end of the document); Fig. E3. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jaci.2012.07.056 | [A] - A. BABAKHIN ET AL, "Experimental desensitisation using a modified allergen adsorbed onto a synthetic Immunomodulator in a murine model of allergic asthma.", ALLERGY, (20070613), vol. 62, no. Suppl. 83, ISSN 0105-4538, page 252, XP055154300 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | [A] - BABAKHIN ET AL, "Allergen-specific Immunotherapy Using A Highly Modified Allergen And The Immunomodulator Polyoxidonium In A Murine Model Of Allergic Asthma", JOURNAL OF ALLERGY AND CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20070101), vol. 119, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.JACI.2006.11.252, ISSN 0091-6749, page S59, XP005756142 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jaci.2006.11.252 | [X] - KATARZYNA NIESPODZIANA ET AL, "A hypoallergenic cat vaccine based on Fel d 1-derived peptides fused to hepatitis B PreS", JOURNAL OF ALLERGY AND CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, (20110601), vol. 127, no. 6, doi:10.1016/j.jaci.2011.02.004, ISSN 0091-6749, pages 1562 - 1570.e6, XP055014054 [X] 1-6 * the whole document * * In particular: Title; Abstract; Materials and methods section, in essence p. 1563-1564, bridging paragraph. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jaci.2011.02.004 | [Y] - TERESA E. TWAROCH ET AL, "Carrier-bound, nonallergenic Ole e 1 peptides for vaccination against olive pollen allergy", JOURNAL OF ALLERGY AND CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, (20110701), vol. 128, no. 1, doi:10.1016/j.jaci.2011.03.011, ISSN 0091-6749, pages 178 - 184.e7, XP055014321 [Y] 1-6 * the whole document * * In particular: Title; Abstract; Methods section on page 184e.1. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jaci.2011.03.011 | [Y] - GIALLONGO A ET AL, "IgE and IgG antibodies compete for antigenic determinants of Parietaria officinalis allergen", MOLECULAR IMMUNOLOGY, PERGAMON, GB, vol. 17, no. 8, doi:10.1016/0161-5890(80)90095-4, ISSN 0161-5890, (19800801), pages 1019 - 1024, (19800801), XP023680141 [Y] 1-6 * the whole document * * In particular: Title and abstract; Materials and methods section; Table 1; Fig. 4; p. 1022-1023, bridging paragraph. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0161-5890(80)90095-4 | by applicant | US6596541 | US2012097565 | US2013295097 | - BRADLEY et al., J. Allergy Clin. Immunol., (19910000), vol. 88, pages 661 - 74 | - HEDLIN et al., J. Allergy Clin. Immunol., (19860000), vol. 77, pages 488 - 96 | - J. Allergy Clin. Immunol., (20070000), vol. 120, pages 25 - 85 | - DUFFORT, O.A. et al., Mol. Immunol., (19910000), vol. 28, pages 301 - 309 | - KRISTENSEN, A.K. et al., Biol. Chem., (19970000), vol. 378, pages 899 - 908 | - KAISER L. et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20030000), vol. 278, no. 39, pages 37730 - 37735 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. NP _001041618.1 | - PADLAN et al., FASEB J., (19950000), vol. 9, pages 133 - 139 | - VAJDOS et al., J Mol Biol, (20020000), vol. 320, pages 415 - 428 | - TAYLOR et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (19920000), vol. 20, pages 6287 - 6295 | - SHAMJI et al., J. Immunol. Methods, (20060000), vol. 317, no. 1-2, pages 71 - 79 | - POWELL et al., "Compendium of excipients for parenteral formulations", J Pharm Sci Technol, (19980000), vol. 52, pages 238 - 311, XP009119027 | - WU et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19870000), vol. 262, pages 4429 - 4432 | - GOODSON, Medical Applications of Controlled Release, (19840000), vol. 2, pages 115 - 138 | - LANGER, Science, (19900000), vol. 249, pages 1527 - 1533 | - BRADLEY et al., J Allergy Clin Immunol, (19910000), vol. 88, pages 661 - 74 | - CHAPMAN MD et al., J. Immunol., (19880000), vol. 140, pages 812 - 818 | - KULIS et al., J. Allergy Clin Immunol., (20110000), vol. 127, no. 1, pages 81 - 88 | - EVAN GI et al., "Isolation of monoclonal antibodies specific for human c-myc proto-oncogene product", Mol. Cell. Biol., (19850000), vol. 5, pages 3610 - 3616, XP000856291 |