Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11242994 | Global Dossier | 08.02.2022 | B2 | US2019376689 | 12.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1854962 | 07.06.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110578934 | Global Dossier | 17.12.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1854962 | 07.06.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3578884 | Global Dossier | 05.08.2020 | B1 | EP3578884 | 11.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1854962 | 07.06.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR3082284 | 11.12.2020 | B1 | FR3082284 | 13.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1854962 | 07.06.2018 |