EP3604726 - DOOR FRAME OR DOOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Holzbau Schmid GmbH & Co. KG Ziegelhau 1-4 73099 Adelberg / DE | [2020/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmid, Claus Schnurrstraße 14 73099 Adelberg / DE | 02 /
Schembecker, Andreas Hugstraße 16 73035 Göppingen / DE | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | Weisbrodt, Bernd, et al Ring & Weisbrodt Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Hohe Straße 33 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | [2024/15] |
Former [2020/06] | Ring & Weisbrodt Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Hohe Strasse 33 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 19178556.7 | 05.06.2019 | [2020/06] | Priority number, date | DE201820103251U | 08.06.2018 Original published format: DE 202018103251 U | DE201820105092U | 06.09.2018 Original published format: DE 202018105092 U | [2020/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3604726 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3604726 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/36, E06B1/52, E05D7/081, E06B7/21, E06B1/04, E05B63/20, E05C7/04, E05C9/02, E05F3/22, E06B7/18 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
E06B3/362 (EP);
E05C7/04 (EP);
E05C9/02 (EP);
E06B1/045 (EP);
E06B1/52 (EP);
E06B7/18 (EP);
E06B7/21 (EP);
E05B63/20 (EP);
E05F2003/228 (EP);
E05Y2201/22 (EP);
E05Y2800/12 (EP);
E05Y2800/416 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/06] | E06B3/36, E06B1/04, E06B7/21, E05D7/081, E06B1/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/37] |
Former [2020/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TÜRUMRAHMUNG BZW. TÜR | [2020/06] | English: | DOOR FRAME OR DOOR | [2020/06] | French: | CADRE DE PORTE OU PORTE | [2020/06] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/37] | 05.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE666349 (ALOIS HAUCK ING) [A] 2* page 2, lines 58-79; figure 3 *; | [XI]DE29919878U (VER HOLZBAUBETR E WILHELM PFAL [DE]) [X] 1-5,8,9,11,14,15 * page 3, paragraph l - page 4, paragraph 1; figures 1,5 * * page 7, paragraph 3 - page 8, paragraph 4 * [I] 6,7,10,12,13; | [XAI]DE202004001797U (SCHMID HOLZBAU GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,3,8,9,14,15 * paragraphs [0018] - [0025]; figures 1-5 * [A] 2 [I] 4,6,7,10-13; | [XI]US2017204652 (CLARKE JR JAMES THOMAS [US], et al) [X] 1,5,8,9,15 * figure 7a * * abstract * [I] 6,7,10,12,13 | Examination | GB612094 | CH423177 |