EP3572855 - INTEGRATED PHOTONICS WAVEGUIDE GRATING COUPLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.05.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universiteit Gent Sint-Pietersnieuwstraat 25 9000 Gent / BE | For all designated states IMEC vzw Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | [2024/36] |
Former [2019/48] | For all designated states Universiteit Gent Sint-Pietersnieuwstraat 25 9000 Gent / BE | ||
For all designated states IMEC vzw Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAETS, Roeland Hazenpark 11 9800 Deinze / BE | 02 /
VERMEULEN, Diedrik Gentstraat 72 9170 Sint-Pauwels / BE | 03 /
LI, Yanlu Lindenlei 25 9000 Gent / BE | 04 /
DE KONINCK, Yannick Berthoudersplein 51/102 2800 Mechelen / BE | [2019/48] | Representative(s) | Winger Mouterij 16 bus 101 3190 Boortmeerbeek / BE | [2024/36] |
Former [2019/48] | DenK iP Leuvensesteenweg 203 3190 Boortmeerbeek / BE | Application number, filing date | 19178638.3 | 13.09.2012 | [2019/48] | Priority number, date | GB20110015784 | 13.09.2011 Original published format: GB 201115784 | [2019/48] | Previously filed application, date | WO2012EP67971 | 13.09.2012 | [2019/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3572855 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3572855 | Date: | 04.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/12, G02B6/30, G02B6/293, G02B6/124 | [2019/48] | CPC: |
G02B6/12004 (EP);
G02B6/124 (EP,US);
G02B6/29326 (US);
G02B6/30 (EP,US);
G02B6/29316 (US);
G02B6/29328 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/28] |
Former [2019/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTER PHOTONIKWELLENLEITERGITTERKOPPLER | [2019/48] | English: | INTEGRATED PHOTONICS WAVEGUIDE GRATING COUPLER | [2019/48] | French: | COUPLEUR DE RÉSEAU DE GUIDES D'ONDES PHOTONIQUES INTÉGRÉ | [2019/48] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/28] | 29.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12759119.6 / EP2756340 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US5392308 (WELCH DAVID F [US], et al); | [XA]US6285813 (SCHULTZ STEPHEN M [US], et al); | [X]US2004042377 (NIKOLAI PETROV [KR], et al); | [XA]US7184627 (GUNN III LAWRENCE C [US], et al) | Examination | US2005286832 | EP1855131 | US2011188808 | by applicant | US7184627 |