EP3588568 - DISPLAY PANEL, ELECTRONIC APPARATUS INCLUDING THE SAME, AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE ELECTRONIC APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.06.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2024/01] |
Former [2020/01] | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-City Gyeonggi-Do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
An, Jun-yong 18-16, Gyedong-gil Anseong-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
In, Yun-kyeong 1423-501, 20, Dongtandaerosibeom-gil Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Choi, Junwon 1037, 495, Dongtan-daero Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Hwang, Wonmi 102-403, 110, Dasan-ro 36-gil, Jung-gu Seoul / KR | [2020/01] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2020/01] | Application number, filing date | 19178696.1 | 06.06.2019 | [2020/01] | Priority number, date | KR20180071858 | 22.06.2018 Original published format: KR 20180071858 | [2020/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3588568 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3588568 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H10K59/131, G02F1/1345 | [2023/08] | CPC: |
G02F1/13452 (EP);
H10K59/131 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H10K59/12 (CN);
H10K59/88 (US);
H01L23/544 (US);
H05K1/0266 (KR);
H05K1/0269 (EP);
H05K1/147 (KR);
H05K3/321 (KR);
H10K59/1201 (KR,US);
H10K59/1213 (KR);
H10K59/123 (KR);
H10K59/40 (KR);
H10K59/8051 (KR);
H10K59/8052 (KR);
H10K71/70 (KR);
H01L2223/54406 (US);
H01L2223/54426 (US);
H05K1/189 (EP);
H05K2201/09918 (EP);
H05K2201/10128 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/01] | H01L27/32, G02F1/1345 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/29] |
Former [2020/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ANZEIGETAFEL, ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG DAMIT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER ELEKTRONISCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [2020/01] | English: | DISPLAY PANEL, ELECTRONIC APPARATUS INCLUDING THE SAME, AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE ELECTRONIC APPARATUS | [2020/01] | French: | PANNEAU D'AFFICHAGE, APPAREIL ÉLECTRONIQUE LE COMPRENANT ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE L'APPAREIL ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2020/01] | Examination procedure | 10.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/29] | 10.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 01.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23178435.6 / EP4235285 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.01.2024 | BG | 03.01.2024 | CZ | 03.01.2024 | ES | 03.01.2024 | HR | 03.01.2024 | LT | 03.01.2024 | LV | 03.01.2024 | PL | 03.01.2024 | SE | 03.01.2024 | NO | 03.04.2024 | RS | 03.04.2024 | GR | 04.04.2024 | IS | 03.05.2024 | PT | 03.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 03.01.2024 | |
BG | 03.01.2024 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2024 | ||
ES | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
LV | 03.01.2024 | ||
PL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
PT | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 03.01.2024 | |
BG | 03.01.2024 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2024 | ||
ES | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 03.01.2024 | |
ES | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 03.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US6198519 (CHANG JONG-WOONG [KR]); | [Y]US2003053056 (OHAZAMA HIDETAKA [JP]); | [A]US2007052344 (WEN YU-LIANG [TW], et al); | [Y]WO2012093468 (SHARP KK [JP], et al); | [Y]KR20170014424 (DONGWOO FINE CHEM CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]US2017357122 (OH MYONG-SOO [KR]) |