EP3581780 - PRIMARY PIPE OF A PRIMARY EJECTION CONDUIT OF A TURBINE ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Operations (S.A.S.) 316, route de Bayonne 31060 Toulouse Cedex 9 / FR | [2019/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GACHES, Thierry C/O AIRBUS OPERATIONS SAS 316 Route de Bayonne 31060 TOULOUSE / FR | 02 /
CZAPLA, Lionel C/O AIRBUS OPERATIONS SAS 316 Route de Bayonne 31060 TOULOUSE / FR | 03 /
SABATHIER, Bastian C/O AIRBUS OPERATIONS SAS 316 Route de Bayonne 31060 TOULOUSE / FR | [2019/51] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Le Guen Maillet 3, impasse de la Vigie CS 71840 35418 Saint-Malo Cedex / FR | [2019/51] | Application number, filing date | 19178867.8 | 06.06.2019 | [2019/51] | Priority number, date | FR20180055081 | 11.06.2018 Original published format: FR 1855081 | [2019/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3581780 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F02K1/82 | [2019/51] | CPC: |
F02K1/827 (EP,CN);
F02C7/24 (US);
F01D9/02 (US);
F05D2230/30 (EP);
F05D2250/283 (EP);
F05D2260/96 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/51] | Title | German: | PRIMÄRROHR EINES PRIMÄREN AUSSTOSSROHRS EINES TURBOTRIEBWERKS | [2019/51] | English: | PRIMARY PIPE OF A PRIMARY EJECTION CONDUIT OF A TURBINE ENGINE | [2019/51] | French: | TUYERE PRIMAIRE D'UN CONDUIT D'EJECTION PRIMAIRE D'UNE TURBOMACHINE | [2019/51] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/48] | 10.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2921684 (BOEING CO [US]) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0032] - [0035] * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2015266586 (RUNYAN MAX R [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0005] , [0020] - [0029] - [0061] - [0064] * * figures 1-3,10-12 *; | [A]US2009019857 (TISDALE RUDOLPH MORRIS [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0035] - [0038] - [0045] , [0071] - [0078] * * figures 3-7 * |