EP3564184 - STRUCTURAL FIBRE-REINFORCED COMPONENT WITH LIGHTNING STRIKE PROTECTION BY USING CARBON NANO TUBE MATS AND METALLIC LAYERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Defence and Space GmbH Willy-Messerschmitt-Straße 1 82024 Taufkirchen / DE | [2019/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Karch, Christian Ulfilasstr. 53 85579 Neubiberg / DE | 02 /
Lenczowski, Blanka Kaiserstrasse 2 85579 Neubiberg / DE | 03 /
Wolfrum, Johannes Kiefernweg 3 84416 Taufkirchen / DE | 04 /
Yeshurun, Yehoshua c/o Tortech Nano fibers Ltd. Koren Industrial Park 24952 Ma'alot / IL | [2019/45] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2023/09] |
Former [2019/45] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19178923.9 | 08.04.2016 | [2019/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3564184 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3564184 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B82Y30/00, B29C70/88, B29C70/02, B64D45/02, // C08J5/00 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
B32B5/022 (EP,US);
B29C70/021 (EP,US);
B29C70/885 (EP,US);
B32B15/08 (EP,US);
B32B15/14 (EP,US);
B32B15/18 (EP,US);
B32B15/20 (EP,US);
B32B27/12 (EP,US);
B32B27/308 (EP,US);
B32B37/14 (US);
B32B5/26 (EP,US);
B32B7/04 (EP,US);
B64D45/02 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C08J5/005 (EP,US);
C08J5/243 (EP,US);
B32B2250/40 (EP,US);
B32B2255/02 (EP,US);
B32B2260/021 (EP,US);
B32B2260/046 (EP,US);
B32B2262/106 (EP,US);
B32B2307/202 (EP,US);
B32B2307/204 (EP,US);
B32B2307/212 (EP,US);
B32B2307/308 (EP,US);
B32B2307/50 (EP,US);
B32B2307/546 (EP,US);
B32B2307/732 (EP,US);
B32B2571/00 (US);
B32B2605/18 (EP,US);
C08K2201/001 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] |
Former [2019/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | STRUKTURKOMPONENTE AUS FASERVERBUNDWERKSTOFF MIT BLITZSCHUTZ DURCH CARBON NANOTUBE-MATTEN UND METALLISCHE LAGEN | [2019/45] | English: | STRUCTURAL FIBRE-REINFORCED COMPONENT WITH LIGHTNING STRIKE PROTECTION BY USING CARBON NANO TUBE MATS AND METALLIC LAYERS | [2019/45] | French: | COMPOSANT STRUCTUREL EN PLASTIQUE RENFORCÉ DE FIBRES AVEC DES PROPRIÉTÉS PARAFOUDRE OBTENUS PAR CARBON NANOTUBES ET COUCHES MÉTALLIQUES | [2019/45] | Examination procedure | 02.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/15] | 02.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.04.2021 | 12.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 15.04.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Appeal following examination | 21.06.2021 | Appeal received No. T1770/21 | 21.06.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 11.08.2021 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.09.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | 29.09.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16164424.0 / EP3228585 | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   23.08.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.03.2023 | CZ | 01.03.2023 | DK | 01.03.2023 | EE | 01.03.2023 | ES | 01.03.2023 | FI | 01.03.2023 | HR | 01.03.2023 | IT | 01.03.2023 | LT | 01.03.2023 | LV | 01.03.2023 | MC | 01.03.2023 | NL | 01.03.2023 | PL | 01.03.2023 | RO | 01.03.2023 | RS | 01.03.2023 | SE | 01.03.2023 | SI | 01.03.2023 | SK | 01.03.2023 | SM | 01.03.2023 | IE | 08.04.2023 | LU | 08.04.2023 | BE | 30.04.2023 | CH | 30.04.2023 | LI | 30.04.2023 | NO | 01.06.2023 | GR | 02.06.2023 | IS | 01.07.2023 | PT | 03.07.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/21] | AT | 01.03.2023 | |
CZ | 01.03.2023 | ||
DK | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
MC | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SI | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
IE | 08.04.2023 | ||
LU | 08.04.2023 | ||
BE | 30.04.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 01.03.2023 | |
CZ | 01.03.2023 | ||
DK | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
MC | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SI | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
LU | 08.04.2023 | ||
BE | 30.04.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 01.03.2023 | |
CZ | 01.03.2023 | ||
DK | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
MC | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
LU | 08.04.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 01.03.2023 | |
CZ | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
MC | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
LU | 08.04.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/04] | AT | 01.03.2023 | |
CZ | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
LU | 08.04.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 01.03.2023 | |
CZ | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 01.03.2023 | |
CZ | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 01.03.2023 | |
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
LT | 01.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US8800911 (KRUCKENBERG TERESA M [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 1, line 20 * * column 1, line 11 - line 13 * * column 3, line 50 - line 54 * * column 3, line 58 - line 60 * * column 5, line 5 - column 6, line 1 * * column 6, line 1 - line 10 * * column 8, line 3 - line 6 * * column 8, line 23 * * column 9, lines 4-9 * * column 9, line 21 - line 44 *; | [A]US2016031569 (KARCH CHRISTIAN [DE], et al) [A] 1-11* paragraph [0005] * | by applicant | DE102007057491 | - GOHARDANI, 0. et al., "Potential and prospective implementation of carbon nanotubes on next generation aircraft and space vehicles: A review of current and expected applications in aerospace sciences", Progress in Aerospace Sciences, (20140000), vol. 70, doi:doi:10.1016/j.paerosci.2014.05.002, page 42, XP029011306 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.paerosci.2014.05.002 |