Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
17.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
19.05.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.05.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
21.05.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
15.09.2020 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | |
04.09.2020 | Change - designated states | published on 07.10.2020 [2020/41] |
31.08.2020 | New entry: Receipt of request for further processing | |
31.08.2020 | New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing | |
28.06.2020 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
17.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant | |
22.05.2020 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.11.2019 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
15.06.2019 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
14.06.2019 | Change - representative |