EP3582063 - WINDOW AND DISPLAY DEVICE COMPRISING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-Do 17113 / KR | For all designated states Special Materials Source 101 Oncheon-ro Paltan-myeon Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 18577 / KR | [2019/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heo, Jin Nyoung 104-2502, 35-29, Myongji-ro 40beon-gil, Cheoin-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Lee, Kilsung 32, Sagimak 1-gil Gwacheon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Sohn, Hoseok 26-1005, Shinbanpo-ro 19gil 10, Seocho-gu Seoul / KR | 04 /
Lee, Yongseok 341-404, 15, Segwon-ro 316beon-gil, Gwonseon-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Lee, Dong Woon 202-704, 98-1, Pogok-ro, Pogok-eup, Cheoin-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 06 /
Jeon, Yusik 2210-901, 104, Dongtansunhwan-daero 20-gil Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 07 /
Choi, Beomgyu 1401, 1065, Cheonho-daero, Gangdong-gu Seoul / KR | [2019/51] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2019/51] | Application number, filing date | 19179626.7 | 12.06.2019 | [2019/51] | Priority number, date | US201862683773P | 12.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862683773 P | KR20180077218 | 03.07.2018 Original published format: KR 20180077218 | [2019/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3582063 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3582063 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/16, H04M1/02, H04M1/18 | [2019/51] | CPC: |
G06F1/1637 (EP);
G02F1/133308 (KR);
G09F9/301 (CN);
G06F1/1652 (US);
B32B17/06 (US);
B32B17/10155 (US);
B32B3/02 (US);
B32B3/30 (US);
C03C17/3405 (US);
G02F1/133302 (US);
G02F1/133331 (KR);
G06F1/1656 (EP);
H04M1/0266 (EP);
H04M1/185 (EP);
C09D161/28 (US);
C09D183/04 (US);
Y10T428/24364 (US);
Y10T428/24529 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/30] |
Former [2019/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FENSTER UND ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2019/51] | English: | WINDOW AND DISPLAY DEVICE COMPRISING THE SAME | [2019/51] | French: | FENÊTRE ET DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE LA COMPRENANT | [2019/51] | Examination procedure | 17.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/30] | 17.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 30.11.2022 | AT | 30.11.2022 | CZ | 30.11.2022 | DK | 30.11.2022 | EE | 30.11.2022 | ES | 30.11.2022 | FI | 30.11.2022 | HR | 30.11.2022 | IT | 30.11.2022 | LT | 30.11.2022 | LV | 30.11.2022 | MC | 30.11.2022 | PL | 30.11.2022 | RO | 30.11.2022 | RS | 30.11.2022 | SE | 30.11.2022 | SI | 30.11.2022 | SK | 30.11.2022 | SM | 30.11.2022 | NO | 28.02.2023 | GR | 01.03.2023 | IS | 30.03.2023 | PT | 31.03.2023 | IE | 12.06.2023 | LU | 12.06.2023 | BE | 30.06.2023 | CH | 30.06.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
MC | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SI | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
IE | 12.06.2023 | ||
LU | 12.06.2023 | ||
BE | 30.06.2023 | ||
CH | 30.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
MC | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SI | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
IE | 12.06.2023 | ||
LU | 12.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
MC | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SI | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
LU | 12.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
MC | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SI | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SI | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 30.11.2022 | |
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | DK | 30.11.2022 | |
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | DK | 30.11.2022 | |
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | ES | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | ES | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | ES | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 30.11.2022 | |
NO | 28.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2012061435 (TAIWAN GREEN POINT ENTPR CO, et al) [I] 1-8,13-15 * page 4, line 4 - page 7, line 3 * * figures 1-5 *; | [XI]WO2012177563 (APPLE INC [US], et al) [X] 1,4-8,13-15 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0078] * * figures 1-4, 7, 9-10 * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0098] * [I] 2,3,9-12; | [XI]US2014353874 (HAN SANG-WOO [KR]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0082] * * figures 1-4 * [I] 2-15; | [A]US2018001347 (CHO HYUN-IL [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0070] ** figures 1-3 * |