EP3582357 - IMPROVED ON-BOARD DEVICE FOR RECHARGING BY DRIVING OF AN ELECTRIC VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.2022 [2022/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTOM Transport Technologies 48, rue Albert Dhalenne 93400 Saint-Ouen / FR | [2019/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOURTANE, Jean-Luc 99, rue des Bancaous 13320 BOUC BEL AIR / FR | 02 /
NEVOT, Nicolas 16 rue du Repos 77330 OZOIR LA FERRIERE / FR | [2019/51] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2019/51] | Application number, filing date | 19179747.1 | 12.06.2019 | [2019/51] | Priority number, date | FR20180055154 | 13.06.2018 Original published format: FR 1855154 | [2019/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3582357 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H02J1/06, H02J7/00, B60L3/00, B60L53/14 | [2019/51] | CPC: |
H02J1/06 (EP,US);
B60L3/0069 (EP);
B60L5/42 (US);
B60L53/14 (EP);
B60L53/16 (US);
H02J1/108 (US);
H02J7/0029 (EP,US);
H02J2310/48 (EP,US);
H02J7/00034 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/02] |
Former [2019/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE ON-BOARD-VORRICHTUNG ZUR WIEDERAUFLADUNG DURCH KONDUKTION EINES ELEKTROFAHRZEUGS | [2019/51] | English: | IMPROVED ON-BOARD DEVICE FOR RECHARGING BY DRIVING OF AN ELECTRIC VEHICLE | [2019/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF EMBARQUE AMELIORE POUR LA RECHARGE PAR CONDUCTION D'UN VEHICULE ELECTRIQUE | [2019/51] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/02] | 03.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/13] | 19.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2012228060 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0016] - [0033] *; | [A]US8465303 (LACOUR GILLES [FR]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * column 1, lines 16-18 * * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 34 * * column 9, lines 36-56 * * column 11, lines 5-45 *; | [A]US2013270903 (NETTELBLAD BO [SE], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0008] - [0009] - [0030] - [0042]; figure 2 *; | [Y]FR3048387 (ALSTOM TRANSP TECH [FR]) [Y] 1-9 * abstract * * page 4, line 15 - page 9, line 35 *; | [A]EP3323661 (ALSTOM TRANSP TECH [FR]) [A] 1-9* the whole document * | by applicant | FR3048387 |