EP3584800 - METHOD FOR PRE-PURIFYING SOLUTIONS CONTAINING RADIONUCLIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nukem Technologies Engineering Services GmbH Industriestraße 13 63755 Alzenau / DE | [2019/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SLAMETSCHKA, Rainer Neue Anlage 9 63526 Erlensee / DE | 02 /
BRÄHLER, Georg Barbarossastraße 15 63549 Freigericht / DE | 03 /
ZULAUF, Alexander Martin-Luther-Str. 2A 63755 Alzenau / DE | [2019/52] | Representative(s) | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert Patentanwalt Friedrich-Ebert-Anlage 11b 63450 Hanau / DE | [2019/52] | Application number, filing date | 19179905.5 | 13.06.2019 | [2019/52] | Priority number, date | DE201810114550 | 18.06.2018 Original published format: DE102018114550 | [2019/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3584800 | Date: | 25.12.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3584800 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G21F9/04, G21F9/10 | [2019/52] | CPC: |
G21F9/04 (EP);
G21F9/10 (EP);
G21F9/28 (RU);
G21F9/30 (RU)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/30] |
Former [2019/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VORREINIGEN VON RADIONUKLIDE ENTHALTENDEN LÖSUNGEN | [2019/52] | English: | METHOD FOR PRE-PURIFYING SOLUTIONS CONTAINING RADIONUCLIDES | [2019/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉ-NETTOYAGE DE SOLUTIONS CONTENANT DES RADIONUCLÉIDES | [2019/52] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/30] | 16.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 31.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 02.08.2023 | EE | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | IT | 02.08.2023 | LT | 02.08.2023 | LV | 02.08.2023 | NL | 02.08.2023 | PL | 02.08.2023 | RO | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SE | 02.08.2023 | SI | 02.08.2023 | SK | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | NO | 02.11.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | PT | 04.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | DK | 02.08.2023 | |
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
IT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | DK | 02.08.2023 | |
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | DK | 02.08.2023 | |
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 02.08.2023 | |
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 02.08.2023 | |
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | LT | 02.08.2023 | |
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 02.08.2023 | |
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03043027 (KRUMPHOLZ UDO [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 3, lines 4-27 *; | [A]WO2004049352 (RWE NUKEM GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 5, lines 1-13; figure 1 *; | [A]DE102004045524 (KERNKRAFTWERK GUNDREMMINGEN GM [DE]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0009] - [0022] *; | [A]JP2009162646 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-12* abstract *; | [XAY]WO2013145237 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND MECHATRONICS SYSTEMS LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-10 * paragraphs [0002] , [0024] , [0025] , [0028] - [0030]; figure 1 * [A] 11,12 [Y] 2; | [XAY]EP2747089 (CDM CONSULTING CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-10 * paragraphs [0016] - [0067] * [A] 11,12 [Y] 2 |