EP3597833 - SEALING TAPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tremco CPG Germany GmbH Werner-Haepp-Str. 1 92439 Bodenwöhr / DE | [2020/39] |
Former [2020/04] | For all designated states tremco illbruck GmbH Werk Bodenwöhr Werner-Haepp-Strasse 1 92439 Bodenwöhr / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAUCK, Helmar Köpenzeile 32 12557 Berlin / DE | 02 /
KÖPPL, Alfred Eichental 1 92431 Neunburg v. W. / DE | 03 /
KOMMA, Markus Anton-Paulus-Str. 6 93133 Burglengenfeld / DE | [2020/04] | Representative(s) | Hannke Bittner & Partner mbB Regensburg Prüfeninger Straße 1 93049 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/04] | Bittner, Bernhard Hannke Bittner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Prüfeninger Strasse 1 93049 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 19179951.9 | 17.05.2013 | [2020/04] | Priority number, date | DE20122005050U | 23.05.2012 Original published format: DE 202012005050 U | DE201220101990U | 31.05.2012 Original published format: DE 202012101990 U | [2020/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3597833 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/62, E06B1/62, E04B1/68 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
E06B1/62 (EP);
E04B1/625 (EP);
E04B1/6812 (EP);
E06B2001/626 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/35] |
Former [2020/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DICHTBAND | [2020/04] | English: | SEALING TAPE | [2020/04] | French: | BANDE D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ | [2020/04] | Examination procedure | 21.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/35] | 22.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13722786.4 / EP2852713 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3544277 (IRBIT RES & CONSULTING AG); | [A]DE4307528 (ILLBRUCK GMBH [DE]); | [A]WO9633321 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al); | [AD]DE19641415 (HANNO WERK GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [A]DE20009674U (HANNO WERK GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [AD]DE10239985 (OEKOLOGISCHE BAUSYSTEME B I MO [DE]); | [A]EP1936247 (ISO CHEMIE GMBH [DE]); | [AD]DE102008037292 (SAINT GOBAIN ISOVER G & H AG [DE]); | [AD]EP2309090 (TREMCO ILLBRUCK PROD GMBH [DE]); | [XP]WO2012167762 (HANNO WERK GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) | by applicant | DE19514420 | DE19641415 | EP1372956 | DE10239985 | US2005284096 | DE19902102 | EP1811111 | DE102008037292 | EP2309090 |